This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 10:47:40 (UTC).

DAVID GONZALEZ-V-PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 DAVID GONZALEZ-V-PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5340

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID GONZALEZ

Defendants

PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC

SAIFEDDIN HASSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID LEE LAW GROUP

515 S. Flower St. Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF NEIL C EVANS

13351 D Riverside Drive Suite 612

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED BY PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF NEILC EVANS.

ANSWER FILED BY PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF NEILC EVANS.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS DAVID LEE LAW GROUP FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING DAVID GONZALEZ FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS DAVID LEE LAW GROUP FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING DAVID GONZALEZ FILED

DECLARATION OF PROCESS DEPT MANAGER MONICA FIGUEROA RE SUB SERVIC FILED

DECLARATION OF PROCESS DEPT MANAGER MONICA FIGUEROA RE SUB SERVIC FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OIF DAVID J LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLA OPPOSITION TO MTN SET ASIDE FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OIF DAVID J LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLA OPPOSITION TO MTN SET ASIDE FILED.

DECLARATION OF DAVID J. LEE IN SUPT OF PLA OPP TO THE MTN SET ASI FILED

DECLARATION OF DAVID J. LEE IN SUPT OF PLA OPP TO THE MTN SET ASI FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR RELIEF FROM DFLT & JMNT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/30/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVID GONZALEZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR RELIEF FROM DFLT & JMNT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/30/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVID GONZALEZ (IMAGED)

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/12/2016 OF DAVID GONZALEZ FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/12/2016 OF DAVID GONZALEZ FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/12/2016 OF DAVID GONZALEZ ORDERED ENTERED 02/23/18; JUDGMENT FOR 07/30/18.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 07/30/18; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $82,438.00 INTEREST $10,852.38 ATTORNEY FEES $3,348.76 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $96,639.14; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DAVID GONZALEZ

DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DAVID GONZALEZ

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/12/2016 OF DAVID GONZALEZ AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/12/2016 OF DAVID GONZALEZ AS TO DOES ONLY

PLAINTIFFS SUMMARY OF CASE (PURS TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 3.1800) FILED.

PLAINTIFFS SUMMARY OF CASE (PURS TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 3.1800) FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/12/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/12/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY DAVID GONZALEZ.

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY DAVID GONZALEZ.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF NEILC EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS DAVID LEE LAW GROUP FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING DAVID GONZALEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO VACATE DEFAULT & DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA LINDSEY 13895; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID LEE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY NEIL C. EVANS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN'S MOTION O VACATE DEFAULT & DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED MOTION AND OPPOSITION.; COURT GIVES WRITTEN TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN'S MOTION O VACATE DEFAULT & DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.; COURT ORDERS PLAINTIFF TO RETURN TO DEFENDANTS THE FUNDS THAT HAD BEEN DISBURSED TO PLAINTIFF; AND/OR HIS ATTORNEY.; ANSWER IS DUE WITHIN THIRTY DAYS OF TODAYS DATE.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/12/2016 OF DAVID GONZALEZ ORDERED SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/12/2016 OF DAVID GONZALEZ.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO PLA TO MOTION RE: TO VACATE DEFLT & DEFLT JMNT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/30/18 FILED BY PACIFIC TRUCK AND AUTO TOWING,INC, SAIFEDDIN HASSAN. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DAVID GONZALEZ FOR FAX FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $13.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: JOHN M SALAZAR RE SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY DAVID GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PROCESS DEPT MANAGER MONICA FIGUEROA RE SUB SERVIC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OIF DAVID J LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLA OPPOSITION TO MTN SET ASIDE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DAVID J. LEE IN SUPT OF PLA OPP TO THE MTN SET ASI FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR RELIEF FROM DFLT & JMNT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/30/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVID GONZALEZ (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DAVID GONZALEZ FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DAVID GONZALEZ FOR FAX FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $38.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DAVID GONZALEZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DAVID GONZALEZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DAVID GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less