This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 23:51:07 (UTC).

DARRYN MORITA -V- CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES

Case Summary

On 11/17/2016 DARRYN MORITA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9673

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARRYN MORITA

Defendant

CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH FARZAM LAW FIRM

11766 Wilshire Blvd # 280

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

LITTLER MENDELSON PC

2049 Century Park East 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DARRYN MORITA.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DARRYN MORITA.

COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPP OF MSJ FILED.

COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPP OF MSJ FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MSJ W/ SUPP DOCS BY PERSONAL ON 02/22/18 AS TO JOSEPH FARZAM, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MSJ W/ SUPP DOCS BY PERSONAL ON 02/22/18 AS TO JOSEPH FARZAM, FILED.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DARRYN MORITA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DARRYN MORITA.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

DECLARATION OF CONNIE L MICHAELS RE:OSC RE SANCTIONS FILED

DECLARATION OF CONNIE L MICHAELS RE:OSC RE SANCTIONS FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,.

NOTICE OF RULING ON 05/30/17 FILED BY DARRYN MORITA.

NOTICE OF RULING ON 05/30/17 FILED BY DARRYN MORITA.

ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LITTLER MENDELSON PC.

ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LITTLER MENDELSON PC.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC.,; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 08:43; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/ SETTLEMENT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 04/23/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DARRYN MORITA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DARRYN MORITA FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180319-0231 $6.00; 180319-0231-VS Reference Number 033-0059043488

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPP OF MSJ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MSJ W/ SUPP DOCS BY PERSONAL ON 02/22/18 AS TO JOSEPH FARZAM, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DARRYN MORITA FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 161206-0420 $3.00; 161206-0420-VS Reference Number 0260001047311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PARTY PREVIOUSLY SERVED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DARRYN MORITA FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161117-0846 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.