This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/29/2018 at 16:56:48 (UTC).

DARLEN LANDRETH -V- CRESTWOOD CORP

Case Summary

On 04/22/2010 DARLEN LANDRETH filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CRESTWOOD CORP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4351

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

DARLENE LANDRETH

PETE BOESE

Defendants and Respondents

FAIRHAVEN ESTATES III, LP

CAROL ASQUITH

KATHLEEN A GARVEY

CITRUS EDGE REALTY

CWD MORTGAGE

CRESTWOOD CORPORATION

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

ALESSI & KOENIG

20651 Golden Springs Drive #240

Diamond Bar, CA 91789

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JAMES W BATES

2418 Honolulu Avenue Suite J

Montrose, CA 91020

CARLSON LAW GROUP

21031 Ventura Blvd Ste 1100

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

BRIAN CAVE

3161 Michelson Drive Ste1500

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $26,722.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $26,722.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0538 $25.00; 160916-0538-CK Reference Number 7466

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0540 $25.00; 160916-0540-CK Reference Number 7466

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0542 $25.00; 160916-0542-CK Reference Number 7466

    Read MoreRead Less
388 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2010
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 7/22/10 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MARTIN A HILDRETH PRESIDING.; CLERK: LESLIE RICHARDSON; COURT REPORTER MICHELE WATSON 10280; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; THOMAS J BAYARD FOR DARLENE LANDRETH, CRESTWOOD CORPORATION NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 PAYABLE TO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 08/23/10.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL (PLTFS FTA/SERVE) SET FOR 09/02/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/22/2010 OF DARLENE LANDRETH, PETE BOESE, CWD MORTGAGE, CITRUS EDGE REALTY, FAIRHAVEN ESTATES III, LP, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC, CAROL ASQUITH, KATHLEEN A GARVEY IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • UPDATE FIRM ADDRESS OF THOMAS J BAYARD, ATTORNEY FOR DARLENE LANDRETH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100422-6914 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • NOTICE OFRELATED CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant