This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 20:17:47 (UTC).

DANIEL JASON WECHSLER

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 DANIEL JASON WECHSLER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0706

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESTHER WECHSLER

Decedent

DANIEL JASON WECHSLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

, VOORHEES LAW GROUP

13831 Roswell Ave Suite D

Chino, CA 91710

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/30/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/30/17 FILED.

HRG OF 08/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED)TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED)TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170901-0198 $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY HOLLY RATZLAFF PRESENT FOR ESTHER WECHSLER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED 07/11/2017 OF ESTHER WECHSLER IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED 07/11/2017 OF ESTHER WECHSLER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ESTHER WECHSLER FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 170817-0281 $15.00; 170817-0281-VS Reference Number 031-0036103679

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED)TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/30/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ESTHER WECHSLER FOR SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-1057 $473.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less