Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 09/08/2018 at 04:23:40 (UTC).

DAKOTA CREEK -V- CABRAL

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 DAKOTA CREEK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CABRAL. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4276

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAKOTA CREEK APARTMENT HOMES LP

Defendant

VINCENT CABRAL

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES

3691 Adams Street

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN RUNNER BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN RUNNER BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0339 $25.00

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/21/2017 OF DAKOTA CREEK APARTMENT HOMES LP ORDERED ENTERED 06/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DAKOTA CREEK APARTMENT HOMES LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VINCENT CABRAL, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VINCENT CABRAL, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO VINCENT CABRAL SERVED ON 06/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO VINCENT CABRAL SERVED ON 06/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VINCENT CABRAL, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VINCENT CABRAL, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/25/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/25/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170621-0335 $255.00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN RUNNER BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0339 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/21/2017 OF DAKOTA CREEK APARTMENT HOMES LP ORDERED ENTERED 06/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DAKOTA CREEK APARTMENT HOMES LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VINCENT CABRAL, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VINCENT CABRAL, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO VINCENT CABRAL SERVED ON 06/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VINCENT CABRAL, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/21/2017 OF DAKOTA CREEK APARTMENT HOMES LP AS TO VINCENT CABRAL, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/21/2017 OF DAKOTA CREEK APARTMENT HOMES LP, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDAT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/25/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $48.16.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170621-0335 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less