This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:35:40 (UTC).

CU REVEST -V- ORTLOFF

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 CU REVEST -V- ORTLOFF was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3125

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CU REVEST, LLC

Defendant

EDNA E. ORTLOFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IN HOUSE COUNSEL

404 Camino Del Rio S Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CU REVEST, LLC FOR 3 ABSTRACTS; Minutes; Receipt: 180209-0406 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED BY CU REVEST, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CU REVEST, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CU REVEST, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 10/17/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CU REVEST, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: EDNA E. ORTLOFF; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,296.95 INTEREST $1,238.30 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $319.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,854.25; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON EDNA E. ORTLOFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CU REVEST, LLC AS TO EDNA E. ORTLOFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SECTION 1022 CCP FILED BY CU REVEST, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDNA E. ORTLOFF; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CU REVEST, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CU REVEST, LLC FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0416 $240.00; 170711-0416-CK Reference Number CK 701842

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less