This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 01:29:34 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET -V- BLACK

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 CROWN ASSET filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLACK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7336

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

VALENCIA BLACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERSOLVE LEGAL GROUP, LLP

9301 Corbin Ave Ste 1600

Northridge, CA 91324

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF NADER S SABAWI IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE POS FILED

DECLARATION OF NADER S SABAWI IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE POS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VALENCIA BLACK WITH COSTS OF $67.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VALENCIA BLACK WITH COSTS OF $67.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VALENCIA BLACK WITH COSTS OF $90.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VALENCIA BLACK WITH COSTS OF $90.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VALENCIA BLACK WITH COSTS OF $90.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VALENCIA BLACK WITH COSTS OF $90.00

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/08/2017 OF CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/08/2017 OF CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/13/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VALENCIA BLACK; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,108.73 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $565.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,673.73; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/08/2017 OF CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VALENCIA BLACK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/08/2017 OF CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC AS TO VALENCIA BLACK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF PROOF OF SERVICE/POSSIBLE SANCTIONS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VALENCIA BLACK; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:39; PLAINTIFF COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT DEFENDANT WAS RECENTLY SERVED ON 05/04/18. NO RESPONSIVE; PLEADING HAS BEEN FILED TO DATE. COUNSEL IS IN THE PROCESS OF PREPARING THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/TSC SET FOR 09/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DECLARATION OF SARAH JANE REYNOLDS IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE PROOF OF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • FILED PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF A SUMMONS PUBLISHED AS TO VALENCIA BLACK. PUBLICATION COMPLETED ON 05/04/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VALENCIA BLACK WITH COSTS OF $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VALENCIA BLACK WITH COSTS OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170911-0687 $240.00; 170911-0687-CK Reference Number 105505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.