This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 08:06:05 (UTC).

CRISTNA ABAUNZA -N- WALTER MENDOZA, JR

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CRISTNA ABAUNZA -N- WALTER MENDOZA, JR was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0270

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRISTNA ABAUNZA

Respondent

WALTER R MENDOZA JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY CRISTNA ABAUNZA RE: C/C C/V C/S (02/01/16); Disposition: Dismissed; Minutes; MICHAEL BISHAY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: EILEEN CHRISTIANSEN; COURT REPORTER WENDY LUCERO 11855; BAILIFF: P BUSH; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CRISTNA ABAUNZA, WALTER R MENDOZA JR; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MOVING PARTY FAILED TO APPEAR; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT: V14 (CANCELLATION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS FILE SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FAMILY COURT SERVICES: APPT FEBRUARY 22, 2016 @ 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CRISTNA ABAUNZA IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING APPOINTMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CRISTNA ABAUNZA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CRISTNA ABAUNZA FOR 1ST PAPER/RFO IN THE AMOUNT OF $525.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • JBSIS STAT-CUSTODY AND VISITATION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/01/2016 OF CRISTNA ABAUNZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • JBSIS STAT - CHILD SUPPORT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CRISTNA ABAUNZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CRISTNA ABAUNZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY CRISTNA ABAUNZA RE: C/C C/V C/S (02/01/16).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less