This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/21/2019 at 01:41:52 (UTC).

CREDITORS -V- DF ENERGY GROUP, INC., ETAL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 CREDITORS -V- DF ENERGY GROUP, INC , ETAL was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9002

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU

Defendants

DF ENERGY GROUP,INC.,

DANFENG JU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J FREED

14226 Ventura Blvd Po Box 5914

Sherman Oaks, CA 91413

 

Court Documents

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DF ENERGY GROUP,INC.,, DANFENG JU FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DF ENERGY GROUP,INC.,, DANFENG JU FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DF ENERGY GROUP,INC., SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $44.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DF ENERGY GROUP,INC., SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $44.00.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU ORDERED ENTERED 02/26/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DF ENERGY GROUP,INC.,, DANFENG JU; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $174,212.00 INTEREST $29,258.07 ATTORNEY FEES $1,200.00 COSTS $543.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $205,213.07; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 & EC 1551 FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU

DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 & EC 1551 FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON DF ENERGY GROUP,INC.,, DANFENG JU.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON DF ENERGY GROUP,INC.,, DANFENG JU.

DECLARATION RE: METHOD OF CALCULATING INTEREST FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU

DECLARATION RE: METHOD OF CALCULATING INTEREST FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU AS TO DOES ONLY

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANFENG JU SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $64.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANFENG JU SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $64.00.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $205,213.07

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $205,213.07

DECLARATION RE: CC SEC 1717.5 FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU

DECLARATION RE: CC SEC 1717.5 FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2028
  • NSF CHECK ( $25.00) FROM CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAUS. NOTICE SENT 04/05/18. DUE 04/25/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $205,213.07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE ALREADY DISPOSITIONED REFER TO JUDGMENT FILED ON 02/26/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • NSF FEE PIF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180509-0953 $65.00; 180509-0953-CK Reference Number 768615

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DF ENERGY GROUP,INC., SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $44.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANFENG JU SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $64.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0395 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less