This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/30/2021 at 07:49:42 (UTC).

CREDITORS TRADE-V-DANTAY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 CREDITORS TRADE-V-DANTAY was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2639

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC.

CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC

Defendants

IAN DANIELSKI

DANTAY RESTAURANT,INC.

DANTAY RESTAURANT, INC

DANIELSKI, IAN

Assignees

GARY E LOONEY

LOONEY, GARY E

GREAT WESTERN COLLECTION BUREAU

COLLECTRONICS OF CALIFORNIA

THE LOBSTER HOUSE

Not Classified By Court

DANIELSKI, IAN MARCE

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON-KAPPOS

3785 Brickway Blvd. #210

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

Assignee Attorney

LOONEY, GARY E

3785 Brickway Blvd. Suite 210

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

 

Court Documents

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTER

06/28/2019: RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTER

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY GARY E LOONEY, FOR 0.00 COS

06/28/2019: MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY GARY E LOONEY, FOR 0.00 COS

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED.

06/28/2019: COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED.

CERTIFIED COPY OF ORIGINAL JDGMNT AND ASSIGNMNT OF

07/30/2019: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORIGINAL JDGMNT AND ASSIGNMNT OF

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

07/30/2019: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON

08/12/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

08/12/2019: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190923-0074; ConversionPayment; $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC. FOR CERTIFIED COPY 190923-0074-CK MJF/ 25.00 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 190923-0074-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 006188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketService type not specified; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 08/12/2019; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 08/06/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 08/06/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190730-0714; ConversionPayment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComment: (Imaged); Comment: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORIGINAL JDGMNT AND ASSIGNMNT OF JDGMNT, CIVRS1201751 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Renewal of Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: LOONEY, GARY E; Awarded Against; DANTAY RESTAURANT, INC.; DANIELSKI, IAN; Amount; Damages: $0.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $6,332.59; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $30.00; Other: $9,236.36; Other Comment: Principle; Total: $15598.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $56.00; Total Payments and Credits: $56.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY GARY E LOONEY FOR ROJ 190730-0714-CK MFF/ 30.00 PAYMT 190730-0714-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 7561

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Comment: MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY GARY E LOONEY, FOR 0.00 COSTS, 0.00 CREDITS, 6332.59 INTEREST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRenewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/13/12 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT GARY E LOONEY HAVE & RECOVER FROM DANTAY RESTAURANT,INC., IAN DANIELSKI: JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,236.36 INTEREST $6,332.59 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $15598.95 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Collectronics of California is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Western Collection Bureau is a litigant

Latest cases where CONV is a litigant