This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 03:43:29 (UTC).

CREATIVE RE SOLUTIONS LLC -V- BANUELOS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 CREATIVE RE SOLUTIONS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BANUELOS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1545

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREATIVE RE SOLUTIONS LLC

Defendants

SAUL FLORES BANUELOS

FLORIDALMA GARCIA LOPEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SAUL FLORES BANUELOS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SAUL FLORES BANUELOS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

COURTESY COPY OF EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE (CIVDS1700164) PLACED IN FILE

COURTESY COPY OF EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE (CIVDS1700164) PLACED IN FILE

COURTESY COPY OF EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE (CIVDS1700164) PLACED IN FILE

COURTESY COPY OF EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE (CIVDS1700164) PLACED IN FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 07/14/17 AS TO HG LONG & ASSOCIATES, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 07/14/17 AS TO HG LONG & ASSOCIATES, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY SAUL FLORES BANUELOS, FLORIDALMA GARCIA LOPEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY SAUL FLORES BANUELOS, FLORIDALMA GARCIA LOPEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SAUL FLORES BANUELOS.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SAUL FLORES BANUELOS.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0163 $255.00; 170711-0163-CK Reference Number 1175235

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ALL DOCUMENTS MUST BE FILED IN THE MASTER CASE CIVDS1700164.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • VACATE STATC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/03/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) UDBS1701545 MASTER FILE CIVDS1700164; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- CONSOLIDATED.; DISPOSITION: CONSOLIDATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS HAVE ANSWERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF CREATIVE RE SOLUTIONS LLC AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 07/14/17 AS TO HG LONG & ASSOCIATES, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY SAUL FLORES BANUELOS, FLORIDALMA GARCIA LOPEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY FLORIDALMA GARCIA LOPEZ ON 07/14/17 ADDING PARTY AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SAUL FLORES BANUELOS FOR FAX-COPIES-POSTAGE & ENVELOPE; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0250 $7.71; 170714-0250-VS Reference Number 026 0057142448

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SAUL FLORES BANUELOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $28.20.--BEGINNING ON 07/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0163 $255.00; 170711-0163-CK Reference Number 1175235

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less