This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 10:01:16 (UTC).

CRANDALL -V- WOLIK

Case Summary

On 12/23/2016 CRANDALL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WOLIK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0496

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTOR CRANDALL

Defendants

NICOLAS HOOVER

SHAWNTA AKINS

PETER WOLIK

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED DOES ALREADY DISMISSED FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED DOES ALREADY DISMISSED FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTOR CRANDALL.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTOR CRANDALL.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE AGREEMENT FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/23/2016 OF VICTOR CRANDALL GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTOR CRANDALL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PETER WOLIK, SHAWNTA AKINS, NICOLAS HOOVER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $775.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $193.75 COSTS $650.00 AND DAMAGES $1,135.52.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,754.27; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 1/23/17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 1/23/17); Minutes; Receipt: 170123-0950 $25.00; 170123-0950-CK Reference Number 1164333

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/23/2016 OF VICTOR CRANDALL ORDERED ENTERED 01/17/17; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTOR CRANDALL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PETER WOLIK, SHAWNTA AKINS, NICOLAS HOOVER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: PETER WOLIK, SHAWNTA AKINS, NICOLAS HOOVER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PETER WOLIK, SHAWNTA AKINS, NICOLAS HOOVER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PETER WOLIK, SHAWNTA AKINS, NICOLAS HOOVER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO NICOLAS HOOVER SERVED ON 12/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO NICOLAS HOOVER SERVED ON 12/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO PETER WOLIK SERVED ON 12/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO PETER WOLIK SERVED ON 12/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SHAWNTA AKINS SERVED ON 12/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SHAWNTA AKINS SERVED ON 12/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/26/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/26/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED DOES ALREADY DISMISSED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTOR CRANDALL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/23/2016 OF VICTOR CRANDALL GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTOR CRANDALL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PETER WOLIK, SHAWNTA AKINS, NICOLAS HOOVER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $775.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $193.75 COSTS $650.00 AND DAMAGES $1,135.52.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,754.27; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 1/23/17); Minutes; Receipt: 170123-0950 $25.00; 170123-0950-CK Reference Number 1164333

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM ALL UNKNOWN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM NICOLAS HOOVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM SHAWNTA AKINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM PETER WOLIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161227-0774 $255.00; 161227-0774-CK Reference Number 1163347

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • ADA MEMO SENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less