This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:26:36 (UTC).

COVARRUBIAS VS SEVILLA

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 COVARRUBIAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SEVILLA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7512

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZABDY COVARRUBIAS

Defendant

GILBERTO SEVILLA

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0624 $75.00; 170928-0624-VS Reference Number 031-0046930343

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY ZABDY COVARRUBIAS IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CLAIM WAS FRAUDULENTLY FILED. IT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY ZABDY COVARRUBIAS IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CLAIM WAS FRAUDULENTLY FILED. IT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY ZABDY COVARRUBIAS IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CLAIM WAS FRAUDULENTLY FILED. IT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT SENT DEPARTMENT COMMISSIONER CONNALLY FOR REVIEW.; Minutes; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: CLAIM WAS FILED FRAUDULENTLY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ZABDY COVARRUBIAS FOR POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0632 $0.71; 170928-0632-VS Reference Number 031-0046930343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ZABDY COVARRUBIAS FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0631 $3.50; 170928-0631-VS Reference Number 031-0046930343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ZABDY COVARRUBIAS FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0628 $7.00; 170928-0628-VS Reference Number 031-0046930343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0624 $75.00; 170928-0624-VS Reference Number 031-0046930343

    Read MoreRead Less