Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 11:05:16 (UTC).

COUNTY OF SB -V- HUR

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 COUNTY OF SB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HUR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3405

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

CAL MED PHYSICIANSAND SURGEONS, INC.

ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE

ARROWHEAD COMMUNITY SURGICAL MEDICAL GROUP,

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JUSTIN JUR

PAK H SOON

JUSTIN HUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL

385 North Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KENNETH T HANN & ASSOCIATES

3699 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 860

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Cross Defendant Attorneys

COUNTY COUNSEL

385 North Arrowhead Ave 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

FULLERTON LEMANN SCHAEFER & DOMINICK

215 North D Street Suite 100

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1712

VON BEHREN &HUNTERLLP

2041 Rosecrans Ave

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCS AND INFORMATION FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCS AND INFORMATION FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

ORDER ON RFA RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CIVDS1202053) GRANTED BY COURT FILED

ORDER ON RFA RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CIVDS1202053) GRANTED BY COURT FILED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE: DUE TO THE COURTS UNAVAILABILITY, THE TRIAL; SETTING CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR 06/13/16 IS HEREBY RESET TO 06/28/16 AT 8:30AM IN DEPARTMENT; S24.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/28/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S24

ANSWER FILED BY CAL MED PHYSICIANSAND SURGEONS, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FULLERTON LEMANN SCHAEFER & DOMINICK.

ANSWER FILED BY CAL MED PHYSICIANSAND SURGEONS, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FULLERTON LEMANN SCHAEFER & DOMINICK.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT CAL MED FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT CAL MED FILED.; Minutes; CROSS DEFENDANT CAL MED PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS, INC. , ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ARROWHEAD COMMUNITY; SURGICAL MEDICAL GROUP INC.S ANSWER SHALL BE SERVED WITHIN THIRTY DAYS OF NOTICE OF THIS; ORDER.; ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ARROWHEAD COMMUNITYSURGICAL MEDICAL GROUP, FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ARROWHEAD COMMUNITYSURGICAL MEDICAL GROUP, FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ARROWHEAD COMMUNITYSURGICAL MEDICAL GROUP, SERVED ON 01/11/16 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ARROWHEAD COMMUNITYSURGICAL MEDICAL GROUP, SERVED ON 01/11/16 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

ANSWER FILED BY ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY VON BEHREN &HUNTERLLP.

ANSWER FILED BY ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY VON BEHREN &HUNTERLLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 160128-2599 $435.00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/10/2015 OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO BY JUSTIN HUR

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/10/2015 OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO BY JUSTIN HUR

ANSWER FILED BY JUSTIN HUR, PAK H SOON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KENNETH T HANN & ASSOCIATES.

ANSWER FILED BY JUSTIN HUR, PAK H SOON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KENNETH T HANN & ASSOCIATES.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JUSTIN HUR SERVED ON 11/05/15 WITH FEES OF $36.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JUSTIN HUR SERVED ON 11/05/15 WITH FEES OF $36.00.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/10/2015 OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED CHANGING NAME OF PAK H SOON TO PAK H SOON AKA SOON HYE PAK;

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/10/2015 OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED CHANGING NAME OF PAK H SOON TO PAK H SOON AKA SOON HYE PAK;

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/10/2015 OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/09/2015 OF JUSTIN HUR FILED BY JUSTIN HUR, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF JUSTIN HUR, ON 09/15/17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT ORDERED MEDIATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT ORDERED MEDIATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/10/2015 OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, ON 09/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCS AND INFORMATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE FOR STIP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170403-0010 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/10/2015 OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, JUSTIN HUR IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SUMMONS MUST MATCH COMPLAINT EXACTLY PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS is a litigant