This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:30:48 (UTC).

COUNTY OF SB-V-ERIC PAEZE

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 COUNTY OF SB-V-ERIC PAEZE was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2409

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Defendant

ERIC PAEZE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

385 North Arrowhead Ave 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/02/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR APPLICATION OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, FOR COST 80.00 INTEREST 8750.86.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT OLD CASE NUMBER SCISS143169 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 03/12/07 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO HAVE &; RECOVER FROM ERIC PAEZE:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $8,907.04 INTEREST $8,750.86 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $110.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $17,767.90; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.