This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/12/2018 at 01:13:12 (UTC).

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO -v- RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6088

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Defendants

LOUIS RAMIREZ

KATRINA RAMIREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

385 North Arrowhead Ave 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN ON WRIT FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR WRIT-LA IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( $41811.10 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $105.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,604.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,464.85 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 38327.40 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,145.76)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,464.85) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/19/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LOUIS RAMIREZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/23/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KATRINA RAMIREZ SERVED ON 07/24/11 WITH FEES OF $23.75.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 05/04/2011 OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM COLLL TO COLL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less