This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/21/2021 at 10:05:43 (UTC).

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO -v- HERITAGE, ETAL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2015 COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO filed an Other lawsuit against HERITAGE, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6488

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, A GOVERNMENTAL

Defendants

HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK,INC., A

REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC

LAKESIDE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.,

OASIS INDEPENDENT MEDICAL ASSOCAITES, INC.

DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC.,

HIGH DESERT MEDICAL CORPORATION, A

BAKERSFIELD FAMILYMEDICAL GROUP, INC.,

SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, INC.,

LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION,A MEDICAL

Not Yet Classified

LAKESIDE MEDICAL GROUP, INC

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOPER LUNDY & BOOKMAN INC

1875 Century Park East Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

DOLL AMIR & ELEY LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COU

12/12/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COU

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- TRIAL DATE CONTINUANCE F

02/27/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- TRIAL DATE CONTINUANCE F

NOTICE OF RETURNED CHECK SENT. CHECK #95581 IN THE

02/24/2017: NOTICE OF RETURNED CHECK SENT. CHECK #95581 IN THE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES F

11/04/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES F

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRE-T

10/24/2016: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRE-T

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONF

06/22/2016: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONF

REPLY TO IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF TO MOTION RE-DEMURR

02/05/2016: REPLY TO IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF TO MOTION RE-DEMURR

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING

02/01/2016: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING

DECLARATION OF GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET & CONFER

01/15/2016: DECLARATION OF GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET & CONFER

DEMURRER FILED BY HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK,INC.,

01/15/2016: DEMURRER FILED BY HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK,INC.,

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFTS

12/15/2015: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFTS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON OASIS

11/17/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON OASIS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON LAKESI

11/17/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON LAKESI

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY COUNTY

11/17/2015: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY COUNTY

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

11/10/2015: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

11/10/2015: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY

11/10/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

11/10/2015: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE AT OSC RE DISMISSAL.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL GILBERT OCHOA,JUDGE CLERK: KIMBERLY KANDT COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ;12225 COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE AT OSC RE DISMISSAL. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 7/17/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Original Type: Readiness Calendar; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketComment:; Comment: MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional); Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, A GOVERNMENTAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Original Type: Readiness Calendar; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $3,740.00; Total Payments and Credits: $3,740.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketFee Voided; Comment: ** VOID ** FEE RECEIPT# 151110-2509 VOIDED BY TWARN FROM SORTE RANG IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, A GOVERNMENTAL FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, A GOVERNMENTAL FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES 151110-2509-CK CVT/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued on; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, A GOVERNMENTAL - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OASIS INDEPENDENT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Desert Medical Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant