This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:14:19 (UTC).

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO-V-ARMIJO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO-V-ARMIJO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9450

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Defendants

ELISABETH ARMIJO

STEVEN ARMIJO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

385 North Arrowhead Avenue 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED

JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ORDERED ENTERED 01/17/18; JUDGMENT FOR: COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: STEVEN ARMIJO, ELISABETH ARMIJO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,382.43 INTEREST $140.48 ATTORNEY FEES $1,088.24 COSTS $489.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $11,100.65; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF SHERRY THOMPSON RE:JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF SHERRY THOMPSON RE:JUDGMENT FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON STEVEN ARMIJO, ELISABETH ARMIJO.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON STEVEN ARMIJO, ELISABETH ARMIJO.

DISMISSAL FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO AS TO DOES ONLY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ELISABETH ARMIJO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $27.25 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ELISABETH ARMIJO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $27.25 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEVEN ARMIJO SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH FEES OF $27.25.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEVEN ARMIJO SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH FEES OF $27.25.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( IN THE AMOUNT OF $11,702.11 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $551.46)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL SVC ON 01/31/18 AS TO ATTACHED SVC LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ORDERED ENTERED 01/17/18; JUDGMENT FOR: COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: STEVEN ARMIJO, ELISABETH ARMIJO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,382.43 INTEREST $140.48 ATTORNEY FEES $1,088.24 COSTS $489.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $11,100.65; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ELISABETH ARMIJO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $27.25 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEVEN ARMIJO SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH FEES OF $27.25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less