This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 15:01:58 (UTC).

Countryside Villas-v-andrew Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Countryside Villas-v-andrew Gonzalez in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2401

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Countryside Villas53 Lp

Defendant

Andrew Gonzalez

Other

All Unknown Occupants

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( DROP BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( DROP BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0853 $25.00; 171030-0853-CK Reference Number 57281

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:10 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:10 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:48; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; COUNTRYSIDE VILLAS53 LP REPRESENTED BY TAMMY TERRIT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANDREW GONZALEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY WILLIAM GARRETT.; WITNESS -- TAMMY TERRIT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; ANDREW GONZALEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ANDREW GONZALEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: COUNTRYSIDE VILLAS53 LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANDREW GONZALEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,195.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $340.00 AND DAMAGES $1,035.58.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,070.58; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANDREW GONZALEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/30/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/30/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:10 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:10 HOURS.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DEATINER BY MAIL ON 10/05/17 AS TO DAVID S SCHONFELD, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DEATINER BY MAIL ON 10/05/17 AS TO DAVID S SCHONFELD, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY ANDREW GONZALEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY ANDREW GONZALEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0629 $255.00; 170927-0629-CK Reference Number 57041

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CONFORMED COPIES/WRIT MAILED IN SASE TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( DROP BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0853 $25.00; 171030-0853-CK Reference Number 57281

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • WRIT/712 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:10 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:48; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; COUNTRYSIDE VILLAS53 LP REPRESENTED BY TAMMY TERRIT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANDREW GONZALEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY WILLIAM GARRETT.; WITNESS -- TAMMY TERRIT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; ANDREW GONZALEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ANDREW GONZALEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: COUNTRYSIDE VILLAS53 LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANDREW GONZALEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,195.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $340.00 AND DAMAGES $1,035.58.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,070.58; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANDREW GONZALEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: ORDER FOR FEE WAIVER RECEIVED BACK FROM ANDEW GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL HEARING RECEIVED BACK FROM ANDREW GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANDREW GONZALEZ FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0250 $1.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF ANDREW GONZALEZ IS DENIED.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $39.83.--BEGINNING ON 10/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0629 $255.00; 170927-0629-CK Reference Number 57041

    Read MoreRead Less