Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 23:00:57 (UTC).

CORTEZ -V- FLORES

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 CORTEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1167

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JERONIMA CORTEZ

Defendant

JOSE RICARDO FLORES

 

Court Documents

WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: DENIED

HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:14; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JERONIMA CORTEZ PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; DEFENDANT JOSE RICARDO FLORES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; JOSE RICARDO FLORES'S MOTION CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY JOSE FLORES .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY JERONIMA CORTEZ .; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; CLAIM OF EXEMPTION DENIED.; COURT INDICATES BASED ON DEFENDANTS INFORMATION AS TO HIS FINANCES AND INFORMATION PROVIDED BY; PLAINTIFF THE COURT DENIES DEFENDANTS CLAIM OF EXEMPTION.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Continued

HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:54; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JERONIMA CORTEZ PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; DEFENDANT JOSE RICARDO FLORES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO FINANCIAL INFORMATION PROVIDED BY THE DEFENDANT FOR THE COURT TO MAKE A RULING.; REFERRED TO RESOURCE CENTER; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE WAIVED.; DEFENDANT IS TO FILE AND SERVE FINANCIAL INFORMATION NO LESS THAN 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 171228-0645 $60.00

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB ) (IMAGED)

CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT - UD

CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT - UD

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/26/2017 OF JERONIMA CORTEZ FILED

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/26/2017 OF JERONIMA CORTEZ FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/26/2017 OF JERONIMA CORTEZ ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JERONIMA CORTEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE RICARDO FLORES; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,190.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.00 AND DAMAGES $492.45.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,937.45; ACTION - COMPLETE

STATEMENT OF DECISION AND JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

STATEMENT OF DECISION AND JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:55; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JERONIMA CORTEZ PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; DEFENDANT JOSE RICARDO FLORES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; PARTIES REFERRED TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; WITNESS -- JERONIMA CORTEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- JOSE FLORES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; COURT FINDS:; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; **************************************************; RULING ON FEE WAIVER: BASED UPON PLAINTIFFS TESTIMONY UNDER OATH THAT SHE DOES NOT QUALIFY; FOR A FEE WAIVER, THE COURT, ON ITS OWN MOTION, STRIKES PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR FEE WAIVER AND; THE ORDER BASED UPON THAT REQUEST. PLAINTIFF HAS 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF MAILING OF THIS JUDGMENT; TO PAY THE INITIAL FILING DEE OF $255 OR HER ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED.; **************************************************; JUDGMENT:; PROVIDED THE FILING FEES IN THIS MATTER ARE PAID AS PROVIDED ABOVE, BASED UPON THE FOREFOING, THE; COURT AWARDS JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF FOR FORFEITURE OF THE LEASE, RESTITUTION OF THE; PROPERTY AS AGAINST THE NAMED DEFENDANTS AND ALL KNOWN AND UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS TOGETHER WITH MONEY; DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1190 IN PAST DUE RENT;HOLD OVER DAMAGES OF $492.45 AND COSTS OF; $255 FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $1937.45; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/26/2017 OF JERONIMA CORTEZ ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR JERONIMA CORTEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST JOSE RICARDO FLORES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,190.00, INTEREST $0.00, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, COSTS $255.00, AND DAMAGES $492.45.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,937.45; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOSE RICARDO FLORES. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE JUDGMENT AND PAY FILING FEES.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 6/15/17 MINUTES AND STATEMENT OF DECISION TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 05/30/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 05/30/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSE RICARDO FLORES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSE RICARDO FLORES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:14; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JERONIMA CORTEZ PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; DEFENDANT JOSE RICARDO FLORES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; JOSE RICARDO FLORES'S MOTION CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY JOSE FLORES .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY JERONIMA CORTEZ .; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; CLAIM OF EXEMPTION DENIED.; COURT INDICATES BASED ON DEFENDANTS INFORMATION AS TO HIS FINANCES AND INFORMATION PROVIDED BY; PLAINTIFF THE COURT DENIES DEFENDANTS CLAIM OF EXEMPTION.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:54; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JERONIMA CORTEZ PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; DEFENDANT JOSE RICARDO FLORES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO FINANCIAL INFORMATION PROVIDED BY THE DEFENDANT FOR THE COURT TO MAKE A RULING.; REFERRED TO RESOURCE CENTER; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE WAIVED.; DEFENDANT IS TO FILE AND SERVE FINANCIAL INFORMATION NO LESS THAN 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 171228-0645 $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170825-0534 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT - UD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JOSE RICARDO FLORES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JERONIMA CORTEZ FOR COMPLAINT IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JERONIMA CORTEZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $32.83.--BEGINNING ON 06/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JERONIMA CORTEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,190.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less