This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 14:04:21 (UTC).

CORONA -V- VICTOR VALLEY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 CORONA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VICTOR VALLEY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCarville, Brian S and Arreola, Rafael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0462

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

McCarville, Brian S

Arreola, Rafael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VINCENT ROBERT CORONA

CORONA, VINCENT ROBERT

Defendants

VICTOR VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

VICTOR VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITYA PUBLIC ENTITY

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALBERT ABKARIAN & ASSOCIATES

Attorney at ALBERT ABKARIAN & ASSOCIATES

3827 Ocean Ave

Montrose, CA 91020

Defendant Attorney

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

01/08/2020: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

01/08/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

01/08/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

01/08/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

01/08/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED.

01/08/2020: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON VICTOR

01/17/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON VICTOR

ANSWER FILED BY VICTOR VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY; P

03/06/2020: ANSWER FILED BY VICTOR VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY; P

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY VICTOR VAL

03/06/2020: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY VICTOR VAL

INITIAL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED B

06/23/2020: INITIAL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED B

INITIAL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED B

06/23/2020: INITIAL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED B

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

11/13/2020: Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

Stipulation & Order filed

04/13/2021: Stipulation & Order filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order filed; Comment: to Continue Trial and Related Dates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialVICTOR VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITYA PUBLIC ENTITY; Counter Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-18279; VICTOR VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITYA PUBLIC ENTITY; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialVICTOR VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITYA PUBLIC ENTITY; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $20 check for stip fee paid by DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialVICTOR VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITYA PUBLIC ENTITY; Total Financial Assessment: $20.00; Total Payments and Credits: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF VINCENT ROBERT CORONA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY VINCENT ROBERT CORONA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE 200108-0263-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 200108-0263-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 20606

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Victor Valley Transit Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where CONV is a litigant