This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 22:46:33 (UTC).

COOPER-V-ALBERTSONS

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 COOPER-V-ALBERTSONS was filed as a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvarez, Donald. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0112

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Alvarez, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DENNIS COOPER

COOPER, DENNIS

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S STORESSUB LLC

ALBERTSON'S STORES SUB LLC A DELWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CENTER FOR DISABLITY ACCESS

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Center for Disability Access, LLP

Attorney at Center for Disability Access, LLP

 

Court Documents

proof of mailing

06/14/2021: proof of mailing

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

06/14/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

06/14/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

**CV - Portal Minute Order

06/10/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court Filed

12/01/2020: Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

11/04/2020: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

NOTICE IMAGED

09/18/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

09/18/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

09/18/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

09/18/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

09/18/2020: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: failure to appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: copy of minute order dated 6/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Appearance Status Reviewing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action to Federal Court Filed; Comment: Federal Case Number 5:20-cv-2477

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 10/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20201006-0605; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY DENNIS COOPER FOR 1ST APP 201006-0605-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 201006-0605-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 45184

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF DENNIS COOPER FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSONS STORES, LLP is a litigant