This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 10:19:40 (UTC).

COOK -V- DILLION

Case Summary

On 12/30/2016 COOK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DILLION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0504

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAMRA COOK

Defendants

JESSICA HARRIS

JOSHUA DILLION

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF TAMRA COOK FILED

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF TAMRA COOK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF TAMRA COOK ORDERED ENTERED 02/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: TAMRA COOK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSHUA DILLION, JESSICA HARRIS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3/3/17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3/3/17)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

NOTICE TO DEFT RE:CONTINUANCE OF COURT TRIAL FILED BY TAMRA COOK.

NOTICE TO DEFT RE:CONTINUANCE OF COURT TRIAL FILED BY TAMRA COOK.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JESSICA HARRIS; PARTY SERVED ON 12/30/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JESSICA HARRIS; PARTY SERVED ON 12/30/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/30/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/30/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO DU BY PERSONAL SVC ON 01/05/17 AS TO TAMRA COOK, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO DU BY PERSONAL SVC ON 01/05/17 AS TO TAMRA COOK, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSHUA DILLION, JESSICA HARRIS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSHUA DILLION, JESSICA HARRIS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161230-0297 $255.00; 161230-0297-CK Reference Number 1163806

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170307-0901 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • ** VOID ** BLANK FEE TO FEE WINDOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170306-0124 $25.00; 170306-0124-CK Reference Number 1167474

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF TAMRA COOK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF TAMRA COOK ORDERED ENTERED 02/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: TAMRA COOK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSHUA DILLION, JESSICA HARRIS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3/3/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $20.00.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOSHUA DILLION, JESSICA HARRIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JOSHUA DILLION, JESSICA HARRIS IS GRANTD; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JOSHUA DILLION, JESSICA HARRIS FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $480.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JOSHUA DILLION, JESSICA HARRIS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161230-0297 $255.00; 161230-0297-CK Reference Number 1163806

    Read MoreRead Less