This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/12/2018 at 11:44:22 (UTC).

CONTERA CONSTRUCTION ET AL -V- PFEIFER

Case Summary

On 02/15/2005 CONTERA CONSTRUCTION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PFEIFER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1131

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONTERA CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

RON E VARELA

Defendant

JIM B PFEIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDSLEY, STEPHEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/09/2009

DocketWRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $30.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2009

DocketWRIT RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,966.35.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2008

DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING CHANG & COTE, LLP WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JIM B PFEIFER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2008

DocketUPDATE PARTY ADDRESS FOR JIM B PFEIFER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2008

DocketDEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT AFTER MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2008

DocketORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2008

DocketDECLARATION OF RON VARELA TO TAKE HEARING OFF CALENDAR DUE TO LACK OF SERVICE FILED; Minutes; VACATE ORAP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/08 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT N1.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2008

DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 15.00 ); Minutes; Receipt: 080811-3440 $15.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2008

DocketAPPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 080811-3287 $40.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2008

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
04/15/2005

DocketDECLARATION RE: SERVICE FILED BY CONTERA CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION, RON E VARELA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2005

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE * FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2005

DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED AND FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2005

DocketORDER OF MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE AND TRANSFER OF CASE FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2005

DocketDECLARATION RE: JIM B PFEIFER FILED BY JIM B PFEIFER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2005

DocketAPPLICATION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE AND TRANSFER OF CASE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2005

DocketANSWER FILED BY JIM B PFEIFER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2005

DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL * FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2005

DocketCOMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION); Minutes; Receipt: 051024-0616 $306.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2005

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less