This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:48:44 (UTC).

**COMPLEX*** MIA GORDON -V- AEROTEK INC

Case Summary

On 12/15/2016 COMPLEX MIA GORDON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AEROTEK INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1258

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIA GORDON

Defendant

AEROTEK INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUMENTHAL, NORDREHAUG & BHOWMIK

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

MORGAN, LEWIS, & BROCKIUS LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING ON STATUS OF REMOVAL HEARING FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON STATUS OF REMOVAL HEARING FILED.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY VICTORIA RIVAPALACIO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MIA GORDON.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS THAT MATTER IS TO REMAIN IN FEDERAL COURT.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: HIGHER COURT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY AEROTEK INC. FEDERAL NUMBER 5:17-CV-00225.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY AEROTEK INC. FEDERAL NUMBER 5:17-CV-00225.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT A OSC RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL HAS BEEN SET FOR 08/07/17 AT 08:30AM IN; DEPT S26IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS PLEASE CALL 1 909 708 8678. THANK YOU.

ANSWER FILED BY AEROTEK INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MORGAN, LEWIS, & BROCKIUS LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY AEROTEK INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MORGAN, LEWIS, & BROCKIUS LLP.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIA GORDON.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIA GORDON.

REQUEST TO CONTINUE 1/30/17 CMC CONFERENCE AND ORDER THEREON FILED.

REQUEST TO CONTINUE 1/30/17 CMC CONFERENCE AND ORDER THEREON FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0123 $435.00; 161215-0123-CK Reference Number 319742

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON STATUS OF REMOVAL HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY VICTORIA RIVAPALACIO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MIA GORDON.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS THAT MATTER IS TO REMAIN IN FEDERAL COURT.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: HIGHER COURT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • VACATE CCMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/05/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY AEROTEK INC. FEDERAL NUMBER 5:17-CV-00225.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT A OSC RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL HAS BEEN SET FOR 08/07/17 AT 08:30AM IN; DEPT S26IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS PLEASE CALL 1 909 708 8678. THANK YOU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DEFENDANT AEROTEK INC FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM EMP TO EMPC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • UPDATE CASE NAME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIA GORDON FOR COMPLEX; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0149 $1,000.00; 161215-0149-CK Reference Number 319742

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • GUIDELINES FOR THE COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0123 $435.00; 161215-0123-CK Reference Number 319742

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less