This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 18:31:24 (UTC).

(COMPLEX) MATA -V- HOSPITALITY VENTURES

Case Summary

On 10/25/2016 COMPLEX MATA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HOSPITALITY VENTURES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7879

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADRIENNE C. MATA

Defendant

HOSPITALITY VENTURES NO. 1, LP, A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL V SANTIAGO PC

Kpmg Tower 355 South Grand Ave Ste 2450

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED

ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF DANIWL V. SANTIAGO FILED

DECLARATION OF DANIWL V. SANTIAGO FILED

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ADRIENNE MATA

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ADRIENNE MATA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 01/27/17 AS TO BALMAGES LAW OFFICE, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 01/27/17 AS TO BALMAGES LAW OFFICE, FILED.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY HOSPITALITY VENTURES NO. 1, LP,A.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY HOSPITALITY VENTURES NO. 1, LP,A.

PLA AND DEFS JOINT STATMENT PURSUANT TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT COMPLEX LIT PROGRAM FILED.

PLA AND DEFS JOINT STATMENT PURSUANT TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT COMPLEX LIT PROGRAM FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE REPLY AND DECL OF ADRIENNE MATA FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE REPLY AND DECL OF ADRIENNE MATA FILED.

REPLY TO MOTION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATIONS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/23/17 FILED BY ADRIENNE C. MATA. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO MOTION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATIONS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/23/17 FILED BY ADRIENNE C. MATA. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF ADRIENNE MATA FILED

DECLARATION OF ADRIENNE MATA FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION OF JAMES BOWIE IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATIO FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMES BOWIE IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATIO FILED

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 01/23/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT HOSPITALITY VENTURES NO. 1, LP,A (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 01/23/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT HOSPITALITY VENTURES NO. 1, LP,A (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HOSPITALITY VENTURES NO. 1, LP,A SERVED ON 10/26/16 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HOSPITALITY VENTURES NO. 1, LP,A SERVED ON 10/26/16 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DANIWL V. SANTIAGO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ADRIENNE MATA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 01/27/17 AS TO BALMAGES LAW OFFICE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFENDANT HOSPITALITY VENTURES NO. 1, LP,A; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DANIEL SANTIAGO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JULIE GOERLINGER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; COUNSEL REPRESENT THAT CLASS SIZE IS APPROXIMATELY BETWEEN 40 AND 60 EMPLOYEES.; COURT FINDS:; DISCOVERY STAY LIFTED.; COUNSEL MAY PROCEED WITH BELAIRE WEST NOTICE AND IF AFTER A MEET AND CONFER AN AGREEMENT ON THE; WORDING CANNOT BE REACHED, COMPETING NOTICES MAY BE SUBMITTED FOR THE COURT TO CONSIDER AND DECIDE; ON.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/24/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY HOSPITALITY VENTURES NO. 1, LP,A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLA AND DEFS JOINT STATMENT PURSUANT TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT COMPLEX LIT PROGRAM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ADRIENNE C. MATA FOR COMPLEX CASE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161025-0557 $1,000.00; 161025-0557-CK Reference Number CK D3495671

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ADRIENNE C. MATA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161025-0555 $435.00; 161025-0555-CK Reference Number CK D3495671

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • GUIDELINES FOR THE COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.