This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/02/2021 at 21:13:26 (UTC).

(COMPLEX) MARCUS JOHNSON -V- MATIONAL MENTOR

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 COMPLEX MARCUS JOHNSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MATIONAL MENTOR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohn, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8303

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEW MUSSELMAN

MARCUS JOHNSON

JOHNSON, MARCUS

MUSSELMAN, LEW

Defendants

NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE

NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CALIFORNIA MENTOR

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEUKOLSKY LAW, APC

Attorney at Teukolsky Law, APC

201 S. Lake Ave Ste 305

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorney

DELFINO MADDEN O'MALLEY COYLE & KOEWLER LLP

Attorney at DELFINO MADDEN O'MALLEY COYLE & KOEWLER LLP

 

Court Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

03/02/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed

03/01/2021: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed

Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

02/11/2021: Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

11/09/2020: Miscellaneous Document Filed

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY N

08/26/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY N

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NATI

08/11/2020: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NATI

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

06/12/2020: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE; PARTY

03/06/2020: ANSWER FILED BY NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE; PARTY

NOTICE OF RULINGS MADE AT 02-26-20 INITIAL STAT. C

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF RULINGS MADE AT 02-26-20 INITIAL STAT. C

NOTICE OF ONTENT TO APPEAR BY PHONE FOR 2.27.20 HE

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF ONTENT TO APPEAR BY PHONE FOR 2.27.20 HE

JOINT INITIAL REPORT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC

02/11/2020: JOINT INITIAL REPORT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC

NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE FILED BY NATIONAL MEN

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE FILED BY NATIONAL MEN

AMENDED NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENC

01/29/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON NATION

01/14/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON NATION

NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERNCE FILED B

01/02/2020: NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERNCE FILED B

NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERNCE FILED B

01/02/2020: NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERNCE FILED B

NOTICE IMAGED

12/23/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER RE INITIAL COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC

12/23/2019: ORDER RE INITIAL COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Cohn, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Cohn, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialJOHNSON, MARCUS; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2020-00445; JOHNSON, MARCUS; $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialJOHNSON, MARCUS; Transaction Assessment; $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: Joint stipulation re: agreed-upon facts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Cohn, David; Comment: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: ERIN MUELLER COURT REPORTER KERRY MONTUORI;11516 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY TINA MEHR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARCUS JOHNSON, LEW MUSSELMAN. ATTORNEY LAUREN TEUKOLVKSY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARCUS JOHNSON, LEW MUSSELMAN. ATTORNEY SHAYE SCHRICK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD ACTION CAME ON FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. COUNSEL REPORT THEY ARE AMENABLE TO MEDIATION AND THAT SOME DISCOVERY IS ONGOING. PARTIES ARE CURRENTLY WORKING ON THE LANGUAGE OF A PROPOSED BEL AIRE WEST NOTICE. COUNSEL ARE ADVISED THEY CAN REQUEST AN INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BY CONTACTING THE JUDICIAL ASSISTANT IN THE EVENT THEY CANNOT STIPULATE TO THE NOTICE. - THE COURT INTENDS TO SET THE DEADLINE FOR THE FILING OF THE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION AT THE NEXT HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/02/21 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S26. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $2,890.00; Total Payments and Credits: $2,890.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialJOHNSON, MARCUS; Total Financial Assessment: $16.00; Total Payments and Credits: $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF MARCUS JOHNSON, LEW MUSSELMAN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY MARCUS JOHNSON, LEW MUSSELMAN FOR COMPLEX FEES 191219-0759-CK COS/ 1000.00 PAYMT 191219-0759-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 4396

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY MARCUS JOHNSON, LEW MUSSELMAN FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 191219-0755-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 191219-0755-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 4396

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where California Mentor is a litigant