This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/26/2018 at 00:20:42 (UTC).

(COMPLEX) HUTSENPILLER V HORIZON

Case Summary

On 03/08/2012 COMPLEX HUTSENPILLER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against HORIZON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1202

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIMBERLY MITCHELL

DENISE RODERICK

LINDA MCARTHUR

ALMA MONDRAGON

EUGENE CRUZ

RAYMOND & LINDA MCARTHUR

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

HORIZON COMMUNITIES, LLC

WINDSTAR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

SO CAL SHEET METAL, INC

NORRIS CONSULTING SERVICES, INC.

MARCO DISTRIBUTINGCO

MIDAS SERVICES INC

SANCHEZ GRADING

EXCEL CONTRACTORS,INC

SUPERB PLASTERING INC

FENCEWORKS, INC

C CONSTRUCTION INC

RCR COMPANIES

CNSE COUNTERTOPS, INC.

Other

ROCKHILL INSURANCECOMPANY

85 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN ADELMAN, LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

DUFFY, PATRICK J

535 Anton Blvd 10Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

BRENDAN J COUGHLIN

38 Corporate Park

Irvine, CA 92606

Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BARAK ISAACS

18757 Burbank Boulevard Suite 215

Tarzana, CA 91356

MAINS, CLARK, ARECHAEDERRA & TIEJRINA

1851 E. First Street Suite 460

Santa Ana, CA 92705

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Other Attorneys

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

3460 Wilshire Blvd. 8Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90010

MARSHALL & FRENCH

17901 Von Karman Ave Suite 300

Irvine, CA 92614

ARCHER NORRIS

777 S Figueroa St Ste 4250

Los Angeles, CA 90017

ADRIENNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave Ste 750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& O'MEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd Suite 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive Suite 105

Torrance, CA 90505

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

21680 Gateway Center Drive Suite 140

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

BUREK, LAWRENCE M

550 North Parkcenter Drive Suite 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

ERICKSEN ARBUTHNOT

835 Wilshire Blvd Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 70017

PETERSEN-DEAN, INC.

39300 Civic Center Drive Suite 300

Fremont, CA 94538

GRAVES AND KING LLP

3610 Fourteenth Street 2Nd Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

YALE & BAUMGARTEN LLP

5030 Camino De La Siesta Suite 308

Sann Diego, CA 92108

POLLARD MAVREDAKISCRANERT CRAWFORD

35 North Lake Avenue Suite 500

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE ENTIRE ACTION WAS DISMISSED BY COURT AT THE 7/ 18/14 HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DUPLICATE REQUEST HAS BEEN FILED ON 071814 WITH PR EJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DUPLICATE REQUEST HAS BEEN FILED ON 071814 -.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketHEARING RE: DISMISSAL/SANCTIONS $500.00 IF PAYMENT NOT MADE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MICHAEL & JUDITH HUTSENPILLER; WILSON E YUREK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR HORIZON COMMUNITIES, LLC, HORIZON HIGH DESERTCORPORATION, GALAXY VICTORVILLE,LLC, NORRIS CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., WINDSTAR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS HORIZON ETC, ADVISE THE COURT THE MATTER HAS BEEN SETTLED AND ATTEMPTS; TO FILE DISMISSALS HAVE BEEN REJECTED BY THE CLERKS OFFICE; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: MATTER SETTLED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST HAVE CROSS COMPLAINANTS SIGN OFF ON REQEUST FOR DISMISSAL IN ORDER TO DI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • DocketDISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 07/13/2012 OF HORIZON COMMUNITIES, LLC FILED BY HORIZON COMMUNITIES, LLC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF HORIZON COMMUNITIES, LLC, ON 07/16/14

    Read MoreRead Less
360 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2012
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MICHAEL & JUDITH HUTSENPILLER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/PETITION IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY MICHAEL & JUDITH HUTSENPILLER FOR COMPLEX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 120308-3125 $550.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 120308-3113 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/08/2012 OF MICHAEL & JUDITH HUTSENPILLER, HORIZON HIGH DESERTCORPORATION, GALAXY VICTORVILLE,LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED, NORRIS CONSULTING SERVICES, A CALIFORNIA, WINDSTAR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, A DELAWA IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/08/2012 OF MICHAEL & JUDITH HUTSENPILLER, EMILIANO ALCANTAR, MICHAEL BOWERS, EUGENE CRUZ, DAVID & GABRIEL LUDI, IGNACIO MARTINEZ, RAYMOND & LINDA MCARTHUR, KIMBERLY MITCHELL, ALMA MONDRAGON, MARTHA PALOMINO, STEVEN PAREDES IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C CONSTRUCTION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPERB PLASTERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Excel Contractors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL VALLEY DISTRIBUTING, INC. is a litigant