This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 19:00:09 (UTC).

**COMPLEX PAGA** GARCIA-V-BLUECREW

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 COMPLEX PAGA GARCIA-V-BLUECREW was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohn, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6660

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARIBEL GARCIA

GARCIA, MARIBEL

BLUECREW STAFFING , INC

Defendants

BLUECREW, INC.

BLUECREW, INC

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARKHORDARIAN LAW FIRM, PLC

Attorney at Barkhordarian Law Firm, PLC

6047 Bristol Parkway Second Floor

Culver City, CA 90230

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

08/13/2020: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

08/13/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

08/13/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

08/13/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

08/13/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER RE INITIAL COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC

08/25/2020: ORDER RE INITIAL COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC

NOTICE IMAGED

08/25/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

09/09/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON BLUECR

10/02/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON BLUECR

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

11/18/2020: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Cohn, David; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice (Before Trial); Party; Names; GARCIA, MARIBEL; BLUECREW, INC.; CONV; BLUECREW STAFFING , INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference; Original Type: Complex Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketPersonal Service; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 10/02/2020; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BLUECREW, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/24/20 WITH COSTS OF $64.04 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BLUECREW, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/24/20 WITH COSTS OF $64.04 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200910-0294; ConversionPayment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketFiling Fees Due to the Court on or Before; Comment: FILING FEES OF $1,000.00 DUE TO THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 09/03/20. IF A HEARING HAS BEEN SET, YOU MUST SUBMIT THE FEES ONE DAY PRIOR TO THE HEARING.MARIBEL GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Denied- Fees Due; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 9/03/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Denied- Fees Due; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 9/03/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY MARIBEL GARCIA FOR NEW FILING FEE 200820-0133-CK CVT/ 435.00 PAYMT 200820-0133-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 156008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUECREW LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant