This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 07:29:04 (UTC).

***COMPLEX*** FLORY, ET AL. -V- PULTE HOME CORP.

Case Summary

On 10/03/2017 COMPLEX FLORY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME CORP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohn, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9213

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JANET C. COLLINS

EDMUND F. BARGENDER, AN INDIVIDUAL AND

JOSEPH P. CORRAL

BARBARA J. FLORY

ERIC FORTIN

LANORE O'SULLIVAN

DONALD M. RIVAS

DENNIS MCCULLOUGH

NANCY CORRAL

RONALD KABALIN ANDPATRICIA KABALIN, AS

KURT FRANKLIN, SR.AND LORI FRANKLIN, AS

RHONDA DANIELS

GERALD W. COLLINS

LEELEN L. JORDAN AND DONNA C. JORDAN, AS

BARBARA GRACE

LUCILLE MCCULLOUGH

KATHLENE RACKI

LOUIS D. PRINCE, AN INDIVIDUALAND TRUSTEE

LOIS LORETTA WATTS

Defendant

PLUTE HOME CORPORATION

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

Attorney at Shinnick & Ryan LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Other Attorneys

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK

3 Park Plaza Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92614-8558

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D COHEHN

1551 N Tustin Avenue Suite 750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

HINES HAMPTON

34 Executive Park Suite 260

Irvine, CA 92614

HAMMONS & BALDINO,LLP

2601 Airport Drive Suite 105

Torrance, CA 90505

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LETOFSKY * MCCLAIN

3655 Nobel Drive Ste 400

San Diego, CA 92122

RESNICK & LOUIS, P.C.

9891 Irvine Center Dr Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A HAUSER

1551 North Tustin Ave Ste 830

Santa Ana, CA 92705

LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

BULLARD, BROWN & BEAL

234 E Commonwealth Ave Second Floor

Fullerton, CA 92382

LIEDLE, LARSON, LIDLE & VAIL,LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

FREDRICKSON, MAZEIKA & GRANT

5720 Oberlin Drive

San Diego, CA 92121-1723

RESNICK & LOUIS, PC

9891 Irvine Center Dr Ste 200

Irvine, CA 92618

LAW OFFICE S OF HOLLINGSHEAD &ASSOCIATES

Po Box 293328

Sacramento, CA 95829

LIEDLE, LARSON & VAIL, LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

MURCHISON & CUMMING

801 South Grand Ave 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Hammons & Baldino LLP

Attorney at Hammons & Baldino LLP

Koeller Nebeker Carlson & Haluck

Attorney at Koeller Nebeker Carlson & Haluck

Liedle Larson Lidl & Vail LLP

Attorney at Liedle Larson Lidl & Vail LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO JOSH PARKINSON PAINTING ONLY WAIVER OF COST FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO JOSH PARKINSON PAINTING ONLY WAIVER OF COST FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO JOSH PARKINSON PAINTING ONLY WAIVER OF COST FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO JOSH PARKINSON PAINTING ONLY WAIVER OF COST FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC..

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC..

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC..

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC..

PULTE HOME CORP OBJECTION TO SOUTHERN CALI WEST COAST ELECTRIC OPT OUT OF MEDIATION PROCESS FILED.

PULTE HOME CORP OBJECTION TO SOUTHERN CALI WEST COAST ELECTRIC OPT OUT OF MEDIATION PROCESS FILED.

PULTE HOME CORP OBJECTION TO SOUTHERN CALI WEST COAST ELECTRIC OPT OUT OF MEDIATION PROCESS FILED.

PULTE HOME CORP OBJECTION TO SOUTHERN CALI WEST COAST ELECTRIC OPT OUT OF MEDIATION PROCESS FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY WEST COAST INTERIORS, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY WEST COAST INTERIORS, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY WEST COAST INTERIORS, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY WEST COAST INTERIORS, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

01/29/2018: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

01/29/2018: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON CONSTR

01/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON CONSTR

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

01/29/2018: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

01/29/2018: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

01/29/2018: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT INTERVENTION FILED 04/25/2018 OF CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH FILED BY CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT INTERVENTION FILED 04/25/2018 OF CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH FILED BY CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH, ON 02/01/19

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO CROSS-DEFENDANT QUALITY INTERIORS INC FOR WAIVER OF COSTS ONLY FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO CROSS-DEFENDANT QUALITY INTERIORS INC FOR WAIVER OF COSTS ONLY FILED.

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY IRONSHORE INSURANCECOMPANY, ONBEHALF.

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY IRONSHORE INSURANCECOMPANY, ONBEHALF.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ORTEGA CONSTRUCTION,INC SERVED ON 01/15/18 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ORTEGA CONSTRUCTION,INC SERVED ON 01/15/18 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

204 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; SEAN PADEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED.; PAUL ATIGAPRAMOJ APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NP MECHANICAL, INC..; KIMBERLY SARNI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC..; MARK S DOVE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NP MECHANICAL, INC..; MEGAN CHODZKO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALAN L. FLORY.; VALERY GERARD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CHAMPION WINDOWS, INC..; ROBYN MCCLAIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TWF CONSTRUCTION, INC..; BRANDY P TYLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH.; ATTORNEY RYAN ANTES PRESENT FOR PULTE HOME COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR DEVELOPER.; REASON: DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS PENDING.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/17/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; COUNSEL FOR DEVELOPER TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 190703-0166 $6.00; 190703-0166-VS Reference Number 033-0137251382

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL STATEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLATINUM LANDSCAPE,INC., WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 3/12/19 OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/09/2018 OF MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED FILED BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED, ON 03/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 190327-0081 $6.00; 190327-0081-VS Reference Number 033-0118686330

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; SEAN PADEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED.; ANGELA FIDGER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NP MECHANICAL, INC..; SUZANNE NORRIS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PLATINUM LANDSCAPE,INC..; KIMBERLY SARNI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC..; LUCAS EDWARDS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALAN L. FLORY.; ERIC LARSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CHAMPION WINDOWS, INC..; ROBYN MCCLAIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TWF CONSTRUCTION, INC..; ATTORNEY RYAN ANTES PRESENT FOR PULTE HOME.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC REPORTS THE SETTLEMENT HAS BEEN DRAFTED AND IS; CURRENTLY IN CIRCULATION.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/17/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; COUNSEL FOR FOR DEFENDANT PULTE HOME TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
391 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2017 OF ALAN FLORY, KATHLENE RACKI, DONALD M. RIVAS, ROBERT W. WATTS, LOIS LORETTA WATTS IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2017 OF ALAN FLORY, LANORE O'SULLIVAN, LOUIS D. PRINCE, ANINDIVIDUALAND TRUSTEE IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2017 OF ALAN FLORY, DENNIS MCCULLOUGH, LUCILLE MCCULLOUGH, MICHAEL R. MCDERMOTT IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2017 OF ALAN FLORY, LEELEN L. JORDAN AND DONNA C. JORDAN, AS, RONALD KABALIN ANDPATRICIA KABALIN, AS IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • PARTY RICHARD S. HUTCHINSAND JUDITHJ. HUTCHINS, UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2017 OF ALAN FLORY, JOHN C. HANSEN ANDMARJORIE E.HANSEN, AS, RICHARD S. HUTCHINSAND JUDITHJ. HUTCHINS, IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2017 OF ALAN FLORY, KURT FRANKLIN, SR.AND LORI FRANKLIN, AS, HAROLD V. GRACE, BARBARA GRACE IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • PARTY PULTE HOME CORPORATION UPDATED: CORRECT PARTY NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2017 OF ALAN FLORY, RICHARD ERICKSON AND LYNN ERICKSON, AS, ERIC FORTIN, AVA FORTIN IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER