This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 10:56:52 (UTC).

(COMPLEX CASE)RODRIGUEZ -V- LA-Z-BOY

Case Summary

On 09/16/2016 COMPLEX CASE RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LA-Z-BOY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5392

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAYKEL RODRIGUEZ

Defendants

LZB MANUFACTURING,INC.

LA-Z-BOY INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAPSTONE LAW APC

1875 Century Park East Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART P.C.

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KUNNEL RE PLA REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KUNNEL RE PLA REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KUNNEL RE PLA REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KUNNEL RE PLA REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF SUZY E. LEE ISO MTN TO STAY FILED

DECLARATION OF SUZY E. LEE ISO MTN TO STAY FILED

DECLARATION OF SUZY E. LEE ISO MTN TO STAY FILED

DECLARATION OF SUZY E. LEE ISO MTN TO STAY FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE FILED.

JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE FILED.

OBJECTION TO THIRD JOINT STIP TO CONT CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADL FILED BY PLA

OBJECTION TO THIRD JOINT STIP TO CONT CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADL FILED BY PLA

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO OBJECTION OF STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERT DEADLINE FILED.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO OBJECTION OF STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERT DEADLINE FILED.

JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE; ORDER FILED.

JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE; ORDER FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION OF LACEY RAINWATER IN OPPOSITION TO MTN TO COMPEL LZB FILED

DECLARATION OF LACEY RAINWATER IN OPPOSITION TO MTN TO COMPEL LZB FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL LZB FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL ROGS SET1 SET FOR HEARING ON 01/17/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LA-Z-BOY INCORPORATED, LZB MANUFACTURING,INC. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL LZB FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL ROGS SET1 SET FOR HEARING ON 01/17/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LA-Z-BOY INCORPORATED, LZB MANUFACTURING,INC. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION, DECLARATION BY OVERNIGHT DELIVERY ON 12/22/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION, DECLARATION BY OVERNIGHT DELIVERY ON 12/22/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

NTC OF RULING RE: CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NTC OF RULING RE: CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

JOINT STATEMENT RE: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

JOINT STATEMENT RE: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LA-Z-BOY INCORPORATED; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/19/16 WITH COSTS OF $97.25 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LA-Z-BOY INCORPORATED; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/19/16 WITH COSTS OF $97.25 FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0732 $435.00; 160916-0732-CK Reference Number 16138

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON JOINT STIP TO CONTINUE CLASS CERT DEADLINE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • ON COURT'S MOTION, THE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE HEARING PRESENTLY SET IN THIS CASE, IS ORDERED RESET FOR 01/11/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26. NOTICE SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • HEARING RE: CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SUZY LEE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY ALEXANDER CHEMERS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR LA-Z-BOY INCORPORATED, LZB MANUFACTURING,INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE CLASS CERTIFICATION; DEADLINE.; THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AND REVIEWED THE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE CLASS CERTIFICATION; DEADLINE AND OPPOSITION TO THE STIPULATION FILED BY COUNSEL IN RELATED CASE CIVDS1708561.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS THAT COUNSEL IN RELATED CASE WAS NOT GIVEN NOTICE OF TODAYS; STATUS CONFERENCE, BUT REPRESENTS THAT DEADLINE WOULD ONLY BE EXTENDED FOR A PERIOD OF 3 WEEKS.; COURT FINDS:; STIPULATION APPROVED AND SIGNED.; DEADLINE TO FILE THE MOTION IS 10/12/18; OPPOSITION DUE 11/30/18; REPLY DUE 12/28/18; HEARING ON THE CERTIFICATION MOTION IS RESERVED FOR 01/11/19 AT 8:30 AM IN S26.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO 4TH JOINT STIP TO CONT. CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MAYKEL RODRIGUEZ FOR STIP AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION; Minutes; Receipt: 180813-0204 $20.00; 180813-0204-CK Reference Number CK 16713

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MAYKEL RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2016
  • DEFENDANT LA-Z-BOY INCORPORATED, LZB MANUFACTURING,INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LZB MANUFACTURING,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/19/16 WITH COSTS OF $49.25 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LA-Z-BOY INCORPORATED; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/19/16 WITH COSTS OF $97.25 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • GUIDELINES FOR THE COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MAYKEL RODRIGUEZ FOR COMPLEX CASE; Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0738 $1,000.00; 160916-0738-CK Reference Number 16136/16137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0732 $435.00; 160916-0732-CK Reference Number 16138

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.