Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 05:16:59 (UTC).

(COMPLEX) BIRD -V- PULTE HOME

Case Summary

On 08/20/2015 COMPLEX BIRD filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1961

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

JUSTIN BIRD

DANICA BIRD

TAYLOR ANDERSON

ALAN CHAN

ANTHONY S GORDON

EVA GORDON

YARA HARRIS

TEHSEEN KHAN

ERMA AHMAD

RUBEN MARRON

JULIA MARRON

ANGEL MATUTE

MICHELLE MATUTE

RYAN MCKEEHAN

ASHLEY MCKEEHAN

JAIME MELERO

NELLY MELERO

ADAM NELSON

HEATHER NELSON

EARL A OWEN

125 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Other Attorneys

LINCOLN, GUSTAFSON& CERCOS

550 West "C" Street Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

EUM, DAVID

100 West Broadway Ste 1150

Glendale, CA 91210

HAMRICK & EVANS

2600W Olive Ave Ste 1020

Burbank, CA 91505

BULLARD,BROWN & BEAL LLP

234 E Commonwealth Ave Second Floor

Fullerton, CA 92832

ADRIENNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave Ste 750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

LETOFSKY * MCCLAIN

3655 Nobel Drive Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92122

LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive Suite 105

Torrance, CA 90505

TYSON & MENDES

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

21680 Gateway Center Drive Suite 140

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

ANGULO MCGHEE, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATI

2900 Bristol St. Suite C-207

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

HINES HAMPTON

34 Executive Park Suite 260

Irvine, CA 92614

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK

3 Park Plaza Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92614-8558

FIELDSLAW, APC

400 Oceangate Suite 700

Long Beach, CA 90802

GILL & RHOADES

1660 Union Street, Ste 301

San Diego, CA 92101

LIEDLE, LARSON, LIDLE & VAIL,LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

SPRINGEL & FINK

18100 Von Karman Ave Ste 750

Irvine, CA 92612

FREDRICKSON,

 

Court Documents

RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

REQUEST FOR COURT TO EXECUTE ORDER RE: GFS OF KDI STONEWORKS FILED.

REQUEST FOR COURT TO EXECUTE ORDER RE: GFS OF KDI STONEWORKS FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MORRISETTE ENTERPRISES, INC. SERVED ON 11/22/16 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MORRISETTE ENTERPRISES, INC. SERVED ON 11/22/16 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARING ON 11/30/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT INTEGRITY TILE, INC. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARING ON 11/30/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT INTEGRITY TILE, INC. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP FOR HERMANOS GRADING, INC CHANGES ITS NAME TO LIEDLE, LARSON, LIDLE & VAIL,LLP FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP FOR HERMANOS GRADING, INC CHANGES ITS NAME TO LIEDLE, LARSON, LIDLE & VAIL,LLP FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MACTEC CLEANUP CRP. FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MACTEC CLEANUP CRP. FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANCE JURY FEES FILED BY WILLIAMS MECHANICAL, INC.

NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANCE JURY FEES FILED BY WILLIAMS MECHANICAL, INC.

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC..

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC..

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY AXIS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY AXIS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER TO ALLOW INTERVENTION FILED

ORDER TO ALLOW INTERVENTION FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ORTEGA CONSTRUCTION, INC SERVED ON 12/10/15 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ORTEGA CONSTRUCTION, INC SERVED ON 12/10/15 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO THE MASONRY GROUP OF CALIFORNIA, INC. SERVED ON 12/10/15 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO THE MASONRY GROUP OF CALIFORNIA, INC. SERVED ON 12/10/15 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RJAY CO.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/15/15 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RJAY CO.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/15/15 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO EXPRESS CONTRACTORS, INC SERVED ON 12/11/15 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO EXPRESS CONTRACTORS, INC SERVED ON 12/11/15 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

ORDER GRANTING CASE AS DEEMED AS COMPLEX FILED

ORDER GRANTING CASE AS DEEMED AS COMPLEX FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

228 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2018
  • HEARING RE: DISMISSAL REMAINING PARTIES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT ORDERS THE REMAINING PARTIES/NOT DISMISSED/DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT MOES 1 THROUGH 100 WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET EXPRESS CONTRACTORS, INC WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET JAYAR MANUFACTURINGCOMPANY WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET EXPRESS CONTRACTORS, INC WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT PULTE HOME CORPORATION WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURT;S'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT MOES 1 THROUGH 500,INCLUSIVE WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT JUSTIN BIRD, DANICA BIRD, TAYLOR ANDERSON, ALAN CHAN, ANTHONY S GORDON, EVA GORDON WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT TEHSEEN KHAN, ERMA AHMAD WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT RUBEN MARRON, JULIA MARRON, ANGEL MATUTE, MICHELLE MATUTE, RYAN MCKEEHAN, ASHLEY MCKEEHAN WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT JAIME MELERO, NELLY MELERO, ADAM NELSON, HEATHER NELSON, EARL AOWEN, JOSE HECTOR PERLA WITH PREJUDICE.; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT YARA HARRIS WITH PREJUDICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/06/2016 OF EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC., FILED BY EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC., WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC., ON 02/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT INTERVENTION FILED 01/27/2016 OF AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, ON 02/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER CARRIE LANE 8882; APPEARANCES:; LISA LAWRENCE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JAYAR MANUFACTURINGCOMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; AN APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AS TO JAYAR HAS BEEN SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR; SIGNATURE. THE COURT IS NOT IN RECEIPT OF THE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND WILL SIGN UPON; CONFIRMATION OF NON-OPPOSITION WITH THE ALLOTED 25 DAY PERIOD.; THE JUDICIAL ASSISTANT HAS RESEARCHED THE CASE AND FINDS THERE ARE STILL ACTIVE PARTIES THAT; HAVE NOT BEEN DISMISSED AND WILL PROVIDE NOTICE OF A NEW OSC RE: DISMISSAL SO THE REMAINING; PARTIES CAN FILE THEIR DISMISSALS.; ACTIVE PARTIES REMAINING: EXECUTIVE PLUMBING - CROSS COMPLAINT DATED JANUARY 6, 2016; EXPRESS CONTRACTORS INC - CROSS-COMPLAINT DATED JANUARY 14, 2016; AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY - COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION DATED JANUARY 27, 2016; JAYAR MANUFACTURING CO - CROSS COMPLAINT DATED 3/21/16; CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY - COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION DATED MARCH 11, 2016; ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY - COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION DATED APRIL 6, 2016; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: DISMISSAL REMAINING PARTIES SET FOR 03/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER SETTING DISMISSAL OF REMAINING PARTIE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT TO EXECUTE ORDER IN GOOD FAITH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT TO EXECUTE ORDER RE: GFS OF KDI STONEWORKS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL FILED BY JUSTIN BIRD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/08/2016 OF TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC FILED BY TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC, ON 12/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/08/2016 OF MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC FILED BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC, ON 12/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
401 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/20/2015 OF JUSTIN BIRD, TEHSEEN KHAN, ERMA AHMAD, RUBEN MARRON, JULIA MARRON, ANGEL MATUTE, MICHELLE MATUTE IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/20/2015 OF JUSTIN BIRD, DANICA BIRD, TAYLOR ANDERSON, ALAN CHAN, ANTHONY S GORDON, EVA GORDON, YARA HARRIS IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JUSTIN BIRD FOR COMPLEX CASE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150820-2373 $1,000.00; 150820-2373-CK Reference Number #13596

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JUSTIN BIRD FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150820-2369 $435.00; 150820-2369-CK Reference Number #13596

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EUM DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN ADRIENNE DEE