Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 06:35:24 (UTC).

(COMPLEX) ARVIZU -V- PULTE HOME

Case Summary

On 08/26/2015 COMPLEX ARVIZU filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2331

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARLOS ARVIZU AND MARIA ARVIZU

STEVEN BEARD

JOSEPH CASTRO

DAVID Y CHA AND JEWELS H CHA

BENSON CHU AND ANGELA SHIH

ANTHONY B DAVID AND MARIA TERESA DAVID

EDDIE ESCOBEDO ANDGLORIA ESCOBEDO

RICARDO FLORES ANDJESI FLORES

ALEJANDRO FONSECA AND KARLYN FONSECA

J OMAR GODINEZ

ERNESTO GONZALEZ

ERIC GROVES SR ANDSUZETTE GROVES

JASON ISAAC AND ANDREA I SAAC

LARRY JI AND LI CHEN AS INDIVIDUALS

WAI LUN LAM

WAI LUN LAM AND CINDY HO

MARCO A MONZON ANDISABEL MONZON

GLENN NGUYEN AND HOA DAO AS INDIVIDUALS

JOSEPH PEREZ

MOISES RAZO AND LLOLANDARAZO AS INDIVIDUALS

53 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Other Attorneys

LINCOLN, GUSTAFSON& CERCOS

550 West "C" Street Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

EUM, DAVID

100 West Broadway Ste 1150

Glendale, CA 91210

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive Suite 105

Torrance, CA 90505

BULLARD,BROWN & BEAL LLP

234 E Commonwealth Ave Second Floor

Fullerton, CA 92832

ADRIENNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave Ste 750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

HURRELL CANTRALL LLP

One California Plaza 300 S Grand Ave, 13Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

HINES HAMPTON

34 Executive Park Suite 260

Irvine, CA 92614

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK

3 Park Plaza Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92614-8558

ANGULO MCGHEE, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATI

2900 Bristol St. Suite C-207

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

GILL & RHOADES

1660 Union Street, Ste 301

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED BY CROWTHER PRENTISS CORPORATION, GW SURFACES, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LINCOLN, GUSTAFSON& CERCOS.

ANSWER FILED BY CROWTHER PRENTISS CORPORATION, GW SURFACES, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LINCOLN, GUSTAFSON& CERCOS.

ANSWER FILED BY CROWTHER PRENTISS CORPORATION, GW SURFACES, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LINCOLN, GUSTAFSON& CERCOS.

ANSWER FILED BY CROWTHER PRENTISS CORPORATION, GW SURFACES, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LINCOLN, GUSTAFSON& CERCOS.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RII PLASTERING, INC SERVED ON 01/14/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RII PLASTERING, INC SERVED ON 01/14/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RII PLASTERING, INC SERVED ON 01/14/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RII PLASTERING, INC SERVED ON 01/14/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RII PLASTERING, INC SERVED ON 01/14/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RII PLASTERING, INC SERVED ON 01/14/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON INTEGRITY TILE, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/09/16 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON INTEGRITY TILE, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/09/16 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON INTEGRITY TILE, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/09/16 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON INTEGRITY TILE, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/09/16 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED

DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WALLDESIGN, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/13/16 WITH COSTS OF $148.25 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WALLDESIGN, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/13/16 WITH COSTS OF $148.25 FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY SO-CAL WEST COAST ELECTRIC, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LINCOLN, GUSTAFSON& CERCOS.

ANSWER FILED BY SO-CAL WEST COAST ELECTRIC, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LINCOLN, GUSTAFSON& CERCOS.

NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY CALIFORNIA WHOLESALE MATERIAL SUPPLY, INC.

NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY CALIFORNIA WHOLESALE MATERIAL SUPPLY, INC.

ANSWER FILED BY HERMANOS GRADING, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY HERMANOS GRADING, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP.

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC.

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC.

ANSWER FILED BY A&A FENCE CO INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE MORRISON L AW GROUP.

ANSWER FILED BY A&A FENCE CO INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE MORRISON L AW GROUP.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC SERVED ON 01/09/16 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC SERVED ON 01/09/16 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO QUALITY INTERIORS,INC SERVED ON 01/16/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO QUALITY INTERIORS,INC SERVED ON 01/16/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FINAL STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT NOTES ALL PARTIES FAIL TO APPEAR AND FAILED TO CONTACT THE COURT AS TO NON APPEARANCE. COURT; FURTHER NOTES COUNSEL REPRESENTED AT 10/6/17 HEARING THAT PARTIES HAD REACHED A POSSIBLE; SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. REASON: FAILURE TO APPEAR.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER FROM 10/20/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2016 OF MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC. FILED BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC, ON 10/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • CASE HELD IN S27 FOR NEXT HEARING 10/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEFFREY MCCONNELL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT PULTE HOME CORP..; ATTORNEY DAVID EUM APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC.; ATTORNEY BRENDON DALRYMPLE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ATTORNEY MCCONNELL REPRESENTS HE BELIVES ALL CASES HAVE SETTLED. ATTORNEY DALRYMPLE; REPRESENTS MILGARDS CASE IS THE ONLY STILL ACTIVE BUT SHOULD BE DISMISSED WITHIN A WEEK.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF ATTORNEY DALRYMPLE.; IF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING THIS MATTER MAY BE TAKEN OFF; CALENDAR.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : FINAL STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL SET FOR 10/20/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL ON 10/02/17 AS TO SEE POS FOR MAILING, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/26/2015 OF CARLOS ARVIZU AND MARIA ARVIZU FILED BY CARLOS ARVIZU AND MARIA ARVIZU, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CARLOS ARVIZU AND MARIA ARVIZU, ON 10/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT INTERVENTION FILED 07/29/2016 OF AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY AXIS SUPRLUS INSURANCE COMPANYWITH, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, ON 10/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2015 OF PULTE HOME CORP. FILED BY PULTE HOME CORP., WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF PULTE HOME CORP., ON 10/02/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 9/6/17 OSC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RYAN ANTES PRESENT FOR PULTE HOME.; ATTORNEY MEGAN CHODZCO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CARLOS ARVIZU AND MARIA ARVIZU.; ATTORNEY SUSAN GILL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR AXIS SUPRLUS INSURANCE COMPANYWITH.; ATTORNEY TEMRE FISCHER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GOTHIC LANDSCAPING,INC.; ATTORNEY ERIC LARSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR A&A FENCE CO INC.; ATTORNEY BRENDON DALRYMPLE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ATTORNEY ANTES REQUESTS THE COURT CONTINUE THIS HEARING ONE MORE TIME TO ALLOW FOR SETTLEMENT TO; BE COMPLETELY RESOLVED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; COUNSEL FOR PULTE HOME TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REQUIRED FORM SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT LOCAL FORM 13-16503-360 (CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT) TO THE COURT AS SOON; AS POSSIBLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CARLOS ARVIZU AND MARIA ARVIZU FOR COMPLEX CASE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150826-1615 $1,000.00; 150826-1615-CK Reference Number #13597

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CARLOS ARVIZU AND MARIA ARVIZU FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150826-1612 $435.00; 150826-1612-CK Reference Number #13597

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/26/2015 OF CARLOS ARVIZU AND MARIA ARVIZU, GLENN NGUYEN AND HOA DAO AS INDIVIDUALS, JOSEPH PEREZ, MOISES RAZO AND LLOLANDARAZO ASINDIVIDUALS, TOMMY RODRIGUEZ, BRUCE TANNER JR AND BRAN DON TANNER, RUBEN VELAZQUEZ ANDESPERANZA CISNEROS, JANET WOOD IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/26/2015 OF CARLOS ARVIZU AND MARIA ARVIZU, STEVEN BEARD, JOSEPH CASTRO, DAVID Y CHA AND JEWELS H CHA, BENSON CHU AND ANGELA SHIH, ANTHONY B DAVID ANDMARIA TERESA DAVID, EDDIE ESCOBEDO ANDGLORIA ESCOBEDO, RICARDO FLORES ANDJESI FLORES, ALEJANDRO FONSECA AND KARLYN FONSECA, J OMAR GODINEZ, ERNESTO GONZALEZ IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EUM DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN ADRIENNE DEE