This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 19:35:39 (UTC).

COLUMBIA CREDIT VS LLAMAS

Case Summary

On 10/17/2016 COLUMBIA CREDIT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LLAMAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8261

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES, INC

Defendant

JOSE LLAMAS

Assignee

SACOR FINANCIAL, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN J PUGH

Po Box 160153.

Sacramento, CA 95816

Assignee Attorney

JOSEPH W SCALIA

1911 Douglas Blvd. #85-435

Roseville, CA 95661

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT & FILED APP FOR ROJ BY MAIL ON 12/02/16 AS TO JOSE LLAMAS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT & FILED APP FOR ROJ BY MAIL ON 12/02/16 AS TO JOSE LLAMAS, FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 12/02/16.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 12/02/16.

ORDER RE LOST ORIGINAL NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER RE LOST ORIGINAL NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION RE: LOST NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC

DECLARATION RE: LOST NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC

WRIT RETURN ON ORIGINAL CASE SCISS138157 FILED ON 01/25/17 (IMAGED)

WRIT RETURN ON ORIGINAL CASE SCISS138157 FILED ON 01/25/17 (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC, FOR INTEREST $12273.70.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC, FOR INTEREST $12273.70.

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT OLD CASE # SCISS138157 (IMAGED)

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT OLD CASE # SCISS138157 (IMAGED)

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 10/18/06 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT SACOR FINANCIAL, INC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM JOSE LLAMAS:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $12,290.54 INTEREST $12,273.70 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $24,594.24; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY COLUMBIA CREDIT SERVICES, INC FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180611-0080 $25.00; 180611-0080-CK Reference Number 24352

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180522-0204 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT & FILED APP FOR ROJ BY MAIL ON 12/02/16 AS TO JOSE LLAMAS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 12/02/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE LOST ORIGINAL NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC FOR DEC/ORDER RE LOST ORIGINAL NOTICE OF ROJ; Minutes; Receipt: 171221-0646 $20.00; 171221-0646-CK Reference Number 22253

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RETURN ON ORIGINAL CASE SCISS138157 FILED ON 01/25/17 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC FOR APP FOR ROJ; Minutes; Receipt: 161104-0137 $30.00; 161104-0137-CK Reference Number 3479149

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • PLAINTIFF SACOR FINANCIAL, INC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC, FOR INTEREST $12273.70.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT OLD CASE # SCISS138157 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 10/18/06 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT SACOR FINANCIAL, INC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM JOSE LLAMAS:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $12,290.54 INTEREST $12,273.70 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $24,594.24; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.