Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 02:27:22 (UTC).

COLLINS-V-HEATON ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/07/2015 COLLINS-V-HEATON was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1166

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DINA COLLINS

Defendants

ALYCE HEATON

ESTATE OF ALYCE ROBERTSON

ESTATE OF LORI DODGE

ESTATE OF DOROTHY GROGAN

ESTATE OF FLORENCEELIS

PAUL ELIS

ESTATE OF JUDY GALBREATH

GLEN ANDERSON

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

VIRGINA POBANZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES LEGAL

9431 Haven Avenue

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: QUIET TITLE FILED BY DINA COLLINS.

REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: QUIET TITLE FILED BY DINA COLLINS.

DECLARATION OF ATTY JENNIFER C. JONES IN SPPT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF ATTY JENNIFER C. JONES IN SPPT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.; Minutes; REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AND REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER (DEFAULT PROVE UP) ARE; REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AND REQUEST; TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER (USED TO SET DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING) ARE PART OF DEFAULT; JUDGMENT PACKET TO BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT AS A WHOLE. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE TWO; FORMS ALONG WITH THE REMAINDER OF THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET TO BE SUBMITTED TO; THE COURT FOR REVIEW AND SIGNATURE.

FILED PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF A SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ESTATE OF DOROTHY GROGAN. PUBLICATION COMPLETED ON 12/11/15.

FILED PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF A SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ESTATE OF DOROTHY GROGAN. PUBLICATION COMPLETED ON 12/11/15.

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS IN NEWSPAPER INLAND VALLEY DAILY BULLETIN FOR ESTATE OF LORI DODGE FILED

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS IN NEWSPAPER INLAND VALLEY DAILY BULLETIN FOR ESTATE OF LORI DODGE FILED

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS IN NEWSPAPER INLAND VALLEY DAILY BULLETIN FOR ESTATE OF DOROTHY GROGAN FILED

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS IN NEWSPAPER INLAND VALLEY DAILY BULLETIN FOR ESTATE OF DOROTHY GROGAN FILED

ORDER ON AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO CORRECT NAME FILED

ORDER ON AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO CORRECT NAME FILED

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OR POSTING OF SUMMON FILED BY DINA COLLINS.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OR POSTING OF SUMMON FILED BY DINA COLLINS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ALYCE HEATON. PARTY SERVED ON 08/11/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ALYCE HEATON. PARTY SERVED ON 08/11/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO PAUL ELIS. PARTY SERVED ON 08/18/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO PAUL ELIS. PARTY SERVED ON 08/18/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ESTATE OF FLORENCEELIS. PARTY SERVED ON 08/18/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ESTATE OF FLORENCEELIS. PARTY SERVED ON 08/18/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ESTATE OF JUDY GALBREATH. PARTY SERVED ON 08/11/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ESTATE OF JUDY GALBREATH. PARTY SERVED ON 08/11/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO GLEN ANDERSON. PARTY SERVED ON 08/11/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO GLEN ANDERSON. PARTY SERVED ON 08/11/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNWLDGMNT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED QUIET TITLE OF DINA COLLINS

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED QUIET TITLE OF DINA COLLINS

COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED.

COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150807-0863 $435.00; 150807-0863-CK Reference Number #2399

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DINA COLLINS FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT AND COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 160415-0312 $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • HEARING RE: DEFAULT PROVE UP; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JENNIFER JONES PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF DINA COLLINS PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING ON: PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT PROVE-UP ON QUIET TITLE; WITNESS -- DINA COLLINS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; COURT WILL PARTITION THE REAL PROPERTY AS FOLLOWS: 58.34% TO PLAINTIFF, DINA COLLINS, 25%; TO DEFENDANT ALYCE HEATON, 8.33% TO DEFENDANT PAUL ELIS AND 8.33% TO DEFENDANT GLEN ANDERSON.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED QUIET TITLE OF DINA COLLINS FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED QUIET TITLE OF DINA COLLINS ORDERED ENTERED 04/15/16; JUDGMENT FOR: DINA COLLINS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALYCE HEATON, ESTATE OF ALYCE ROBERTSON, ESTATE OF LORI DODGE, ESTATE OF DOROTHY GROGAN, ESTATE OF FLORENCEELIS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PAUL ELIS, ESTATE OF JUDY GALBREATH, GLEN ANDERSON, VIRGINA POBANZ; SEE JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: DEFAULT PROVE UP SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE BE ADVISED A HEARING RE: DEFAULT PROVE UP HAS BEEN SET IN THIS CASE ON 4/15/16 AT 10:00 AM; IN DEPARTMENT S32 LOCATED AT THE COURT ADDRESS ABOVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER LOCAL RULE 321 CORRECTION FLUID/TAPE NOT ALLOW ED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PLAINTIFF FAILS TO APPEAR THIS DATE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: QUIET TITLE FILED BY DINA COLLINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2015
  • PARTY ESTATE OF DOROTHY GROGAN UPDATED: TO CORRECT NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150807-0863 $435.00; 150807-0863-CK Reference Number #2399

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less