This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:35:58 (UTC).

COLLIER ET AL -V- WELLS FARGO

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 COLLIER -V- WELLS FARGO was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3128

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VENITA COLLIER

KENNETH COLLIER

Defendant

WELLS FARGO , N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KETTNER LAW CORPORATION

2150 West Washington Street #104

San Diego, CA 92110

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WELLS FARGO , N.A.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $39.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF VENITA COLLIER, KENNETH COLLIER FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VENITA COLLIER, KENNETH COLLIER FOR NTC OF PENDECY OF ACTION; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0735 $25.00; 170711-0735-CK Reference Number CK 3564265

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VENITA COLLIER, KENNETH COLLIER FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0732 $435.00; 170711-0732-CK Reference Number CK 3564264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less