This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:31:33 (UTC).

COLLEGE BUSINESS PARK -V- WILSON ADAMS TOBACCO

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 COLLEGE BUSINESS PARK -V- WILSON ADAMS TOBACCO was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1520

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLEGE BUSINESS PARK LLC

Defendant

WILSON ADAMS TOBACCO COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CADDEN & FULLER, LLP

114 Pacifica Suite 450

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WILSON ADAMS TOBACCO COMPANY, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $63.90 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF COLLEGE BUSINESS PARK LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY COLLEGE BUSINESS PARK LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0955 $380.00; 171030-0955-CK Reference Number CK 5159

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less