This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 10:16:55 (UTC).

COLLEEN BALLEJOS -V- GREGORY THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 05/09/2014 COLLEEN BALLEJOS filed an Other lawsuit against GREGORY THOMPSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sachs, Michael A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5738

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Sachs, Michael A

 

Party Details

Petitioners

COLLEEN BALLEJOS

CARA BALLEJOS

CHRISTIAN BALLEJOS

BALLEJOS, COLLEEN

BALLEJOS, CARA

Defendants

GREGORY THOMPSON

THE STARCO GROUP

FOUR STAR CHEMICALLLC

STARCO ENTERPRISESINC

Minors and Petitioners

CARA BALLEJOS

CHRISTIAN BALLEJOS

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

MCCUNE WRIGHT LLP

2068 Orange Tree Ln Suite 216

Redlands, CA 92374

MCCUNEWRIGHT LLP

2068 Orange Tree Lane Suite 216

Redlands, CA 92374

MCCUNE WRIGHT AREVELO. LLP

18565 Jamboree Road Suite 550

Irvine, CA 92612

McCune Wright Arevelo LLP

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevelo LLP

Defendant Attorneys

THOMPSON COE & O'MEARA, LLP

12100 Wilshire Blvd #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

& SMITH, LEWIS BRISBO IS BISGAARD

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS

3333 Fourteenth Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

09/25/2019: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

THOMPSON COE & O'MEARA, LLP IS REMOVED AS ATTORNE

05/20/2019: THOMPSON COE & O'MEARA, LLP IS REMOVED AS ATTORNE

MOTION RE- FROM RELIEF FROM WAIVER SET FOR HEARING

04/04/2017: MOTION RE- FROM RELIEF FROM WAIVER SET FOR HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS-FIRST AMENDED

03/06/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS-FIRST AMENDED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF MCCUNE WRIGHT,

12/08/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF MCCUNE WRIGHT,

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CO

08/23/2016: AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CO

MOTION RE- LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR

07/29/2016: MOTION RE- LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS GILBERT KELLY CROWLEY

09/24/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS GILBERT KELLY CROWLEY

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

05/04/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED 140516-2464-CK CVH- 435.00

05/09/2014: COMPLAINT FILED 140516-2464-CK CVH- 435.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: CASE HAS SETTLED.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SANCTIONS(DEF CNSL FTA/FT COMPLY) MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA;13709 COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MICHELLE VERCOSKI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY ANDREW HUBERT PRESENT FOR DEF- GREGORY THOMPSON. ATTORNEY RONALD CARLSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR FOUR STAR CHEMICALLLC. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED ATTORNEY HUBERTS DECLARATION REGARDING HIS FAILURE TO APPEAR. COURT DOES NOT IMPOSE SANCTIONS AT THIS TIME. - COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: CASE HAS SETTLED. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SANCTIONS(DEF CNSL FTA/FT COMPLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Complaint; Comment: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COLLEEN BALLEJOS FILED BY COLLEEN BALLEJOS, CARA BALLEJOS, CHRISTIAN BALLEJOS, WITH PREJUDICE. DISMISS COMPLAINT OF COLLEEN BALLEJOS, CARA BALLEJOS, CHRISTIAN BALLEJOS, ON 09/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CANNOT ENTER A DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ON A MINOR'S COMP CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: DECLARATION OF ANDREW HUBERT RE: OSC HRG RE SANCTIONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE OF OSC HEARING RE: SANCTIONS FILED BY COLLEEN BALLEJOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SETTLEMENT CCP 664.6/DISMISSAL MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA;13709 COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MICHELE M. VERCOSKI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. LEWIS BRISBO & SMITH FOR GREGORY THOMPSON NOT PRESENT RIGGS KINKLE RODIGER & SP FOR FOUR STAR CHEMICALLLC, STARCO ENTERPRISESINC, THE STARCO GROUP NOT PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT THEY HAVE RECEIVED ONE SETTLEMENT CHECK AND ARE AWAITING THE TWO REMAINING SETTLEMENT CHECKS. - THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT GREGORY THOMPSON, COURT SETS OSC RE: SANCTIONS AS TO DEFENSE COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH TERMS OF SETTLEMENT. SANCTIONS , IF IMPOSED, INCLUDE $500.00 MADE PAYABLE TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT AND $500.00 MADE PAYABLE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. COUNSEL TO SUBMIT DECLARATION FOR THE COURTS REVIEW AT LEAST FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING. - THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS FOUR STAR CHEMICAL LLC, STARCO ENTERPRISES INC., AND THE STARCO GROUP, COURT SETS OSC RE: SANCTIONS AS TO DEFENSE COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH TERMS OF SETTLEMENT. SANCTIONS, IF IMPOSED, INCLUDE $500.00 MADE PAYABLE TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT AND $500.00 MADE PAYABLE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. COUNSEL TO SUBMIT DECLARATION FOR THE COURTS REVIEW AT LEAST FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS(DEF CNSL FTA/FT COMPLY) SET FOR 10/02/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Sachs, Michael A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SETTLEMENT CCP 664.6/DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
221 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted; Comment: PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR CARA BALLEJOS IS COLLEEN BALLEJOS -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY MICHAEL A SACHS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE FILED STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20140516-2464; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $4,118.51; Total Payments and Credits: $4,118.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: VERIFICATION OF COLLEEN BALLEJOS IN SPPT OF PTN TO PRESERVE EVIDNCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED 140516-2464-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 140516-2464-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 6969

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where STARCO ENTERPRISES INC. DBA BLUE DEVIL PRODUCTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer & SMITH, LEWIS BRISBO IS BISGAARD