This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2018 at 22:09:16 (UTC).

COLEMAN -V- HOME DEPOT

Case Summary

On 07/01/2011 COLEMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOME DEPOT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6220

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Intervenors and Plaintiffs

JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY,INC

REGINA COLEMAN

JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY INC

TERRENCE COLEMAN

Defendants

DWAYNE VERNE BERG

WEST COAST CUSTOM ROOMS

REGINA COLEMAN

TERRENCE COLEMAN

HOME DEPO USA INC

HOME DEPOT USA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor and Plaintiff Attorneys

, STONE & HILL S

16633 Ventura Blvd Suite 1420

Encino, CA 91436

ANDERSON & KRIGER

4887 E La Palma Ave Ste 708

Anaheim, CA 92807

Defendant Attorney

CROUCH & RAMEY LLP

2001 Ross Ave 44Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75202

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2013
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TERRENCE COLEMAN FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 130116-1998 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 02553Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TERRENCE COLEMAN FOR FAX FILING 5 PGS; Minutes; Receipt: 121207-1806 $5.00; 121207-1806-MC Reference Number 02553Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BEN T KAYASHIMA, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY ELLEN MURAWA; COURT REPORTER LAURA SANDERS 12273; COURT ATTENDANT D ANDRADE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY KAREN N. KUEMERLE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY KAREN N. KUEMERLE FOR DEFENDANTS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; FINAL FUNDING HAS BEEN RECEIVED. DISMISSAL WAS FILED VIA FACSIMILE ON DECEMBER 6, 2012.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SETTLEMENT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT WEST COAST CUSTOM ROOMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT DWAYNE VERNE BERG.; Minutes; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO WEST COAST CUSTOM ROOMS, DWAYNE VERNE BERG; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/01/2011 OF TERRENCE COLEMAN ORDERED SET ASIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: GABRIELA LEE; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GORDON MEARS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JOHN SHIP APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR HOME DEPOT USA INC.; ATTORNEY JOHN WALKER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY,INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR DISMISSAL.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED ON 10/16/12; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 12/07/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY HOME DEPOT USA INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CROUCH & RAMEY LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 110818-2113 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO WEST COAST CUSTOM ROOMS SERVED ON 08/02/11 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO HOME DEPOT USA INC. PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO DWAYNE VERNE BERG. PARTY SERVED ON 07/21/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/01/2011 OF TERRENCE COLEMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110701-0133 $395.00; 110701-0133-CK Reference Number 39962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less