This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 15:30:27 (UTC).

COLE -V- STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/25/2016 COLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID COHN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2695

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

DAVID COHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HANNAH K COLE

COREY COLE

CORAH D COLE

Plaintiff and Claimant

CORAH D COLE

Defendants

LILLIAN BURNS

JOHN EDSON BURNS

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

PATRICK BURNS

DAVID BURNS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BARRY REGAR

74-900 Hwy 111 Suite 223

Indian Wells, CA 92210

REGAR, BARRY

74-900 Hwy 111 Suite 213

Indian Wells, CA 92210-7104

Defendant Attorney

KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE

550 North Brand Boulevard Suite 1500

Glendale, CA 91203-1922

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER (AMEND) TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED

ORDER (AMEND) TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HANNAH K COLE.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HANNAH K COLE.

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,000.00 FILED.

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,000.00 FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HANNAH COLE BY HANNAH K COLE.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HANNAH COLE BY HANNAH K COLE.

ANSWER FILED BY DAVID BURNS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE.

ANSWER FILED BY DAVID BURNS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE.; Minutes; Receipt: 170526-1007 $435.00; 170526-1007-CK Reference Number 151737

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER GRA TO DEEM CASES RELATED AND SCHEDULE TSC IN S26 ON 12/16/16 FILED

ORDER GRA TO DEEM CASES RELATED AND SCHEDULE TSC IN S26 ON 12/16/16 FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HANNAH COLE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF HANNAH COLE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR CORAH D COLE IS HANNAH K COLE -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DAVID COHN.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR CORAH D COLE IS HANNAH K COLE -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DAVID COHN.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS(FTA/FAILURE VERIFY DEPOSIT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 08/28/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketAction Text: DECL RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT HEARING IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SUBMITTED; OSC RE: SANCTIONS HEARING PR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketAction Text: VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketAction Text: FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171121-0992$5.00; 171121-0992-MC Reference Number 033-0042401354

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketAction Text: VACATE OSCVF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 08/28/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BARRY REGAR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR HANNAH K COLE, COREY COLE, CORAH D COLE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT.; 08:35; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT.; COURT FINDS:; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR:; OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AND FAILING TO FILE VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT WITH THE; COURT.; BARRY REGAR IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $500.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS(FTA/FAILURE VERIFY DEPOSIT) SET FOR 11/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/31/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAction Text: OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR CORAH D COLE IS HANNAH K COLE -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DAVID COHN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketAction Text: SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS NEEDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketAction Text: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketAction Text: FILING FEE PAID BY HANNAH K COLE, COREY COLE, CORAH D COLE FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160225-0236$435.00; 160225-0236-CK Reference Number #2433

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketAction Text: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAction Text: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.