This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:44:17 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES -V- AMANDA WOODS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES -V- AMANDA WOODS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3169

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

AMANDA WOODS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANKLIN J LOVE

800 So Barranca Ave #100

Covina, CA 91723

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $144.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $118.81)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 3,147.99 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FOR WRIT TO SACRAMENTO; Minutes; Receipt: 171218-0433 $25.00; 171218-0433-CK Reference Number 22860

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $69.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $55.47)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 171003-0834 $25.00; 171003-0834-CK Reference Number 22173

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 07/11/2017 OF CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 07/11/2017 OF CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ORDERED ENTERED 09/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AMANDA WOODS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,105.29 INTEREST $258.78 ATTORNEY FEES $360.00 COSTS $274.45 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,998.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO AMANDA WOODS SERVED ON 07/27/17 WITH FEES OF $78.45.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0626 $196.00; 170711-0626-CK Reference Number #21495

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less