This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 23:09:41 (UTC).

(***CMPLX) MELFORD BEARD -V- CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 02/13/2014 CMPLX MELFORD BEARD filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0848

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELFORD BEARD

SHARLYN BEARD

BENJAMIN CABALO

ROSALINDA CABALO

SUJAY DOIJODE

LAWRENCE DURAN

MICHAEL URIBE

SHERYL URIBE

MICHAEL WONG

PAULINE WONG

LEWIS YOUNG

DORIS YOUNG

VINAY S DOIJODE

SARASWATI MAHINDRAKAR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CENTEX HOMES

Cross Defendants

SANTA FE CONNECTION, INC A DISSOLVED

CONTRACT CARPET CORP., AN ACTIVE CALIFORNIA

REGAL CULTURED MARBLE,INC., A DISSOLVED

ACCURATE SHEET METAL, INC., A DISSOLVED

ULTRA-WALL, INC., AN ACTIVE CALIFORNIA

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MILSTEIN ADELMAN, LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

MILSTEIN,ADELMAN,JACKSON,FAIRCHILD & WADE L

10250 Constellation Blvd Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

NEWMEYER & DILLION

895 Dove Street Fifth Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Other Attorneys

ARCHER NORRIS

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 350

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER SETTLEMENT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO LAMPS PLUS-CENTENNIAL, INC., ANACTIVE, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CUSTOM QUALITY MILLWORK, INC.,A DISSOLVED, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER SETTLEMENT); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, MATTER WILL BE CONTINUED TO 11/15/17 AT 8:30A.M. IN DEPTARTMENT S29.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/15/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT CENTEX HOMES TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON AND FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 1 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 02/13/14 AND 01/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
177 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2014
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 8/08/14 AT 8:30 IN R10 - RESCHEDULED TO: IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 8/08/14 AT 8:30 IN S33J IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • CASE IS RE-ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2014
  • DEFENDANT CENTEX HOMES FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 140219-1759 $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCURATE SHEET METAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ULTRA-WALL is a litigant

Latest cases where REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Centex Homes n/k/a Pulte Home Company, LLC is a litigant