This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 13:28:00 (UTC).

CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II -V- FD EVENT CO., LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2016 CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FD EVENT CO , LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2089

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

LYLE LEE BELL

CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II

DANA LOUISE BELL

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

BAG JUMP ACTINO SPORTS, INC.,

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

385 N Arrowhead Avenue.. 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

28TH DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION

FD EVENT CO., LLC

BAG JUMP ACTION SPORTS, INC.,

HON. CHRISTOPHER J. WARNER

FD EVENTS CO., LLC.

Respondent and Cross Defendant

FD EVENTS CO., LLC.

Respondent and Other

HON. CHRISTOPHER J. WARNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

THE HOMAMPOUR LAW FIRM

15303 Ventura Blvd Ste 1450

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

YOUR LEGAL POWER

400 S Fourth St Ste 290

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COUNTY COUNSEL - SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

385 N Arrowhead Avenue.. 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

DISENHOUSE LAW APC

3833 10Th St

Riverside, CA 92501

COLLINS COLLINSMUIR & STEWART

1100 El Centro Street Po Box 250

South Pasadena, CA 91030

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

COLLINS, COLLINS, MUIR & STEWART

750 The City Drive Suite 400

Orange, CA 92868

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Cross Defendant Attorney

1100 EL CENTRO STREET

Po Box 250

South Pasadena, CA 91030

 

Court Documents

DEFT FD EVENT CO, LLCS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

DEFT FD EVENT CO, LLCS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

DEFT FD EVENT CO, LLCS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

DEFT FD EVENT CO, LLCS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT PACK IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED.

DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT PACK IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT PACK IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED.

DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT PACK IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED.

DECLARATION OF ARASH HOMAMOUR ISO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION FILED

DECLARATION OF ARASH HOMAMOUR ISO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION FILED

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

SEP STMT ISO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESP TO SPEC IN TERROG SET ONE FILED.

SEP STMT ISO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESP TO SPEC IN TERROG SET ONE FILED.

NOTICE NON-OPPOSITION TO MSJ FILED BY CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II, DANA LOUISE BELL, LYLE LEE BELL.

NOTICE NON-OPPOSITION TO MSJ FILED BY CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II, DANA LOUISE BELL, LYLE LEE BELL.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 05/27/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II, DANA LOUISE BELL, LYLE LEE BELL (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 05/27/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II, DANA LOUISE BELL, LYLE LEE BELL (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED.

STIPULATION RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED.

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED AND SENT TO PARTIES.

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED AND SENT TO PARTIES.

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL FILED.

ORDER APPROVING REFEREES FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS FILED

ORDER APPROVING REFEREES FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS FILED

PLTFS RESPONSIVE STATEMENT TO DEFTS SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED.

PLTFS RESPONSIVE STATEMENT TO DEFTS SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED.

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONT. TRIAL READ. CONF. & SETTING TRIAL DATE FILED BY CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II, DANA LOUISE BELL, LYLE LEE BELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE TRIAL READINESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II, DANA LOUISE BELL, LYLE LEE BELL FOR STIP TO CONTINUE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180828-0685 $20.00; 180828-0685-CK Reference Number #174455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II, DANA LOUISE BELL, LYLE LEE BELL.; Minutes; Receipt: 180509-0307 $150.00; 180509-0307-CK Reference Number CK 168549

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:00 HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY COUNTY COUNSEL - SAN BERNARDINOCOUNTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/11/2016 OF CLIFFORD GORDON, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • PARTY BAG JUMP ACTION SPORTS, INC., UPDATED: DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CLIFFORD JOHN GORDON II FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160211-0304 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.