This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 00:55:28 (UTC).

CLAUDIA P PRECIADO GUERRERO -N- MOISES L PACO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 CLAUDIA P PRECIADO GUERRERO -N- MOISES L PACO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8302

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLAUDIA PATRICIA PRECIADO GUERRERO

Respondent

MOISES LUBBERT PACO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF CLAUDIA PRECIADO GUERRERO FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF CLAUDIA PRECIADO GUERRERO ORDERED ENTERED 02/08/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON MOISES LUBBERT PACO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MOISES LUBBERT PACO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF CLAUDIA PRECIADO GUERRERO AS TO MOISES LUBBERT PACO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT PACKET IS BEING RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: ON FL-165 NEED TO; COMPLETE ITEM 3B AND ALSO DATE ITEM 4 WHERE MARKED IN RED NEED TO ADDRESS ITEM 8 FOR BOTH; PARTIES ON FL-170ON FL-180 NEED TO ADDRESS ITEM 4L AND 4M -ON FL-190 NEED TO COMPLETE BOTTOM; PORTION OF DOCUMENT PLEASE MAKE SURE TO MAKE ALL CORRECTIONS TO THE COPIES AS WELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CLAUDIA PATRICIA PRECIADO GUERRERO FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MOISES LUBBERT PACO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVIC OF SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DOCUMENTS ARE INCOMPLETE. PLEASE MAKE CORRECTIONS WHERE CHECKED IN RED..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0601 $435.00; 170927-0601-VS Reference Number 030-0040880086

    Read MoreRead Less