This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:05:04 (UTC).

CLARK VS TROSPER/SMITH

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 CLARK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TROSPER/SMITH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7670

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

JAMES CLARK

ELAINE CLARK

Defendants and Others

BARBARA J SMITH

KARLA TROSPER

JAMES CLARK

ELAINE CLARK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NEJX SENT.

NOTICE OF NEJX SENT.; Minutes; NEJX; NOTICES PRINTED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:48; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ELAINE CLARK, JAMES CLARK PRESENT; DEFENDANT KARLA TROSPER, BARBARA J SMITH PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- JAMES CLARKS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- KARLA TROSPER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 02:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS CLAIM; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELAINE CLARK ORDERED ENTERED 11/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ELAINE CLARK, JAMES CLARK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BARBARA J SMITH; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,295.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $140.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,435.00; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT KARLA TROSPER WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; DUE TO THE FACT THAT TROSPER WAS SUED ONLY AS A REPRESENTATIVE OF; BARBARA SMITH; AS TO THE DEFENDANTS CLAIM; JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 11/14/2017 OF KARLA TROSPER ORDERED ENTERED 11/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: KARLA TROSPER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ELAINE CLARK, JAMES CLARK; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $300.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $300.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

DECLARATION OF JAMES CLARK AND ELAINE CLARK FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMES CLARK AND ELAINE CLARK FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KARLA TROSPER. PARTY SERVED ON 11/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KARLA TROSPER. PARTY SERVED ON 11/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO BARBARA J SMITH. PARTY SERVED ON 11/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO BARBARA J SMITH. PARTY SERVED ON 11/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM FILED AS TO ELAINE CLARK. PARTY SERVED ON 11/15/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM FILED AS TO ELAINE CLARK. PARTY SERVED ON 11/15/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM FILED AS TO JAMES CLARK. PARTY SERVED ON 11/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM FILED AS TO JAMES CLARK. PARTY SERVED ON 11/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY KARLA TROSPER (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY KARLA TROSPER (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171114-0650 $30.00

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • PARTY BARBARA J SMITH UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • SC-222 ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS IS GRANTED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • REQ TO MAKE PMTS IS APPROVED FOR BARBARA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS FILED BY ELAINE CLARK, JAMES CLARK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS SENT.; Minutes; REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS AND RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS FILED BY BARBARA J SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON DEFENDANTS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • AUDIO CD AND AUDIO UPLOAD COMPLETED ON 12/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ELAINE CLARK IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ELAINE CLARK FOR SC-100 IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JAMES CLARK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JAMES CLARK IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JAMES CLARK FOR SC-100 IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less