This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:42:33 (UTC).

CKB VIENNA-V-SHEASBY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 CKB VIENNA-V-SHEASBY was filed as a Contract - Business lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8891

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CKB VIENNA, LLP

10390 Commerce Center Dr Suite 110

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SHEASBY AND ASSOCIATES

MATTHEW SHEASBY

MATTHEW E. SHEASBY

SHEASBY & ASSOCIATES

MATTHEW E SHEASBY

Cross Defendants

CKB VIENNA, LLC

10390 Commerce Center Dr Suite 110

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

ROES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

CKB VIENNA, LLP

10390 Commerce Center Dr Suite 110

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

2855 East Guasti Road Suite 400

Ontario, CA 91761

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KIM IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KIM IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITON TO MOTION RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SET FOR HEARING ON 11/27/17 FILED BY CKB VIENNA, LLP. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITON TO MOTION RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SET FOR HEARING ON 11/27/17 FILED BY CKB VIENNA, LLP. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KIM IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KIM IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMES MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMES MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KIM IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KIM IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMES MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMES MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMES MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMES MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITON TO MOTION RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SET FOR HEARING ON 11/27/17 FILED BY CKB VIENNA, LLP. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITON TO MOTION RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SET FOR HEARING ON 11/27/17 FILED BY CKB VIENNA, LLP. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MATTHEW E. SHEASBY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MATTHEW E. SHEASBY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ANSWER FILED BY MATTHEW E. SHEASBY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BEST BEST & KRIEGER.

ANSWER FILED BY MATTHEW E. SHEASBY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BEST BEST & KRIEGER.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) SET FOR HEARING ON 11/27/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT MATTHEW SHEASBY, SHEASBY AND ASSOCIATES (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) SET FOR HEARING ON 11/27/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT MATTHEW SHEASBY, SHEASBY AND ASSOCIATES (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CKB VIENNA, LLP - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CKB VIENNA, LLP - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

DECLARATION OF JESSICA LOMAKIN IN OPPOSITION TO PRELIM INJUNCTION FILED

DECLARATION OF JESSICA LOMAKIN IN OPPOSITION TO PRELIM INJUNCTION FILED

DECLARATION OF RANDALL VALADEZ FILED

DECLARATION OF RANDALL VALADEZ FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLA APP FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLA APP FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO CKB VIENNA, LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 11/21/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO CKB VIENNA, LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 11/21/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS(DEF COUNSEL FTA 03/27)/TRIAL SETTING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL KIM PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JESSICA LOMAKIN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENSE COUNSELS FTA.; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AND REVIEWED THE DECLARATION OF JESSICA LOMAKIN FILED ON; 04/05/18.; COURT FINDS:; THERE BEING NO OBJECTIONS RAISED BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, THE OSC RE: SANCTIONS AS AGAINST; DEFENSE COUNSEL IS WAIVED BY THE COURT.; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY DEMANDED BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 5 DAY(S).; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS REQUEST THAT THE COURT ORDER PARTIES TO COURT-SPONSORED MEDIATION; OR A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS DENIED BY THE COURT. COUNSEL ARE TO MEET AND CONFER; REGARDING MEDIATION AND IF THERE IS AN AGREEMENT BY ALL PARTIES CAN TELEPHONE THE DEPARTMENT; DIRECTLY TO SCHEDULE A MEDIATION DATE.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 01/10/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/14/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S26A ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CKB VIENNA, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR CKB VIENNA, LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 180425-0240 $150.00; 180425-0240-CK Reference Number CK 6123

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JESSICA K. LOMAKIN IN RESPONSE TO OSC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 3/27/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL KIM PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; 08:32; BEST BEST & KRIEGER FOR MATTHEW SHEASBY, MATTHEW E. SHEASBY, SHEASBY AND ASSOCIATES NOT PRESENT; COURT FINDS:; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE MADE BY DEFENSE COUNSEL, THE COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER; TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST DEFENSE COUNSEL FOR FAILING TO; APPEAR.; DEFENSE COUNSEL IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $250.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL MAY SUBMIT A DECLARATION REGARDING EXPENSES INCURRED AS A RESULT OF; DEFENSE COUNSELS NON-APPEARANCE AND THE COURT MAY IMPOSE ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED TO COINCIDE WITH THE OSC RE SANCTIONS.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED IN ADVANCE OF THE NEXT HEARING. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE DEEMED; A WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS(DEF COUNSEL FTA 03/27)/TRIAL SETTING SET FOR 04/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY MATTHEW E. SHEASBY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BEST BEST & KRIEGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MATTHEW E. SHEASBY.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO MATTHEW E. SHEASBY; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CKB VIENNA, LLP FOR EX PARTE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171023-0036 $90.00; 171023-0036-CK Reference Number 2699

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF CKB VIENNA, LLP - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CKB VIENNA, LLP FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CKB VIENNA, LLP FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0732 $435.00; 170927-0732-CK Reference Number 2678

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less