This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 15:38:30 (UTC).

CITY OF NEEDLES -V- KEITH ENTS USA ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2011 CITY OF NEEDLES filed an Other lawsuit against KEITH ENTS USA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gibson, John B, Powers, Margaret A, Foster, Bryan and Sachs, Michael A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0085

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gibson, John B

Powers, Margaret A

Foster, Bryan

Sachs, Michael A

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

05/01/2017: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ST

04/14/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ST

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

04/11/2017: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED.

04/06/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED.

ORDER RE DISCHARGE OF RECEIVER, EXONERATION OF SUR

03/13/2017: ORDER RE DISCHARGE OF RECEIVER, EXONERATION OF SUR

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APRIL 11, 2017 FILED.

03/08/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON APRIL 11, 2017 FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISCHARGEOF RECEIVER AND EXONERATION O

03/03/2017: REQUEST FOR DISCHARGEOF RECEIVER AND EXONERATION O

ORDER APPROVING SEPTEMBER 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING

11/07/2016: ORDER APPROVING SEPTEMBER 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING

SEPTEMBER 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP

10/31/2016: SEPTEMBER 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP

ORDER APPROVING AUGUST 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING FI

10/11/2016: ORDER APPROVING AUGUST 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING FI

AUGUST 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INC

09/30/2016: AUGUST 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INC

ORDER APPROVING JULY 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING FILED

08/31/2016: ORDER APPROVING JULY 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING FILED

JULY 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INCOM

08/29/2016: JULY 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INCOM

ORDER APPROVING JUNE 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING FILED

08/01/2016: ORDER APPROVING JUNE 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING FILED

JUNE 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INCOM

07/27/2016: JUNE 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING OF RECEIVERSHIP INCOM

ORDER APPROVING EIGHTH REPORT OF RECEIVER FILED

07/18/2016: ORDER APPROVING EIGHTH REPORT OF RECEIVER FILED

ORDER APPROVING MAY 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING FILED

07/05/2016: ORDER APPROVING MAY 2016 MONTHLY ACCOUNTING FILED

EIGHTH REPORT OF RECEIVER AND DECLARATION OF MARK

07/05/2016: EIGHTH REPORT OF RECEIVER AND DECLARATION OF MARK

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/11/2017

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL(SETTLED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2017

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL(SETTLED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2017

DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THIS CASE HAS BEEN PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED AS OF 04/14/17.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2017

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2017
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2017

DocketSet Aside Default of; Comment: SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON THE KEITH ENTS USA, LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2017

DocketSet Aside Disposition of Defendant; Comment: SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT KEITH ENTS USA, LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2017

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Comment: HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: PATRICIA GUERRERO COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS;9826 COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THE COURT NOTES THE ORDER TO DISCHARGE RECEIVER WAS FILED 03/13/17. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL(SETTLED) SET FOR 07/11/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22. CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 04/11/17 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
229 More Docket Entries
11/17/2011

DocketProof of Service; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 11/17/2011; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & PETITION FILED AS TO KEITH ENTS USA, LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 10/24/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2011

DocketProof of Service; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 11/17/2011; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & PETITION FILED AS TO T&M INVESTORS V,L.P. PARTY SERVED ON 11/07/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2011

DocketProof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & PETITION FILED AS TO KEITH ENTS USA, LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 10/24/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2011
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & PETITION FILED AS TO T&M INVESTORS V,L.P. PARTY SERVED ON 11/07/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2011

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $28.50; Total Payments and Credits: $28.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2011

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2011

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2011

DocketSummons Issued on; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF CITY OF NEEDLES - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2011

DocketSet Default Department to; Comment: SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2011
View Court Documents

DocketPetition Filed (Civil); Comment: PETITION FILED (CIVIL) ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF CITY OF NEEDLES FOR PLAINTIFF CITY OF NEEDLES, BEST BEST & KRIEGER IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less