This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2018 at 06:03:06 (UTC).

CITY OF NEEDLES-V-CO.OF SAN BDNO,ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/10/2013 CITY OF NEEDLES-V-CO OF SAN BDNO, was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF NEEDLES

Respondents

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

OFFICE OF SAN BDNOCO. AUDITOR-CONTROLLER

LARRY WALKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Y & PINKNEY, SLOVAK BARON EMPEY MURPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/12/2013

DocketSTATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2013

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2013

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUM/PET NTC/STATUS ADR NTC/ASSIGN FILED AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. PARTY SERVED ON 01/23/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS AGENT. WITH FEES OF $75.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2013

DocketFEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 130111-3597 $19.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2013

DocketCOPIES MAILED TO ATTY OF RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2013

DocketCASE SCANNED & PLACED IN NEEDLES BOX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2013

DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2013

DocketPURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR CITY OF NEEDLES ARE WAIVED FOR CIVIL FILING & FIRST PAPER FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2013

DocketSET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2013

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2013

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2013

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2013

DocketPETITION FILED (CIVIL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less