This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 07:00:17 (UTC).

City of Fontana -v- Southern California Edison Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 City of Fontana filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Southern California Edison Company. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6789

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Fontana

a Municipal corporation

Defendants

Southern California Edison Company

County of San Bernardino

Union Carbride Corporation

Linde Inc

Kaiser Steel Corporation

a California Corporation

a body corporate and politic, of the State of California

a corporation

a Delaware corporation

a corporation of the State of Nevada

Does 1 - 50

All persons unknown, et al

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Best Best & Krieger

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger

Alvaradosmith

COUNTY COUNSEL

Rutan & Tucker, LLP

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

 

Court Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

06/01/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Order Filed Re:

05/18/2021: Order Filed Re:

**CV - Portal Minute Order

05/03/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Declaration Filed

04/19/2021: Declaration Filed

Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed

04/19/2021: Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed

Answer Filed

04/16/2021: Answer Filed

Stipulation & Order filed

04/09/2021: Stipulation & Order filed

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

03/19/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Answer Filed

03/12/2021: Answer Filed

Declaration Filed

03/11/2021: Declaration Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

03/11/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

02/16/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Disclaimer Filed

02/16/2021: Disclaimer Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

01/19/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

01/19/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

01/19/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Declaration Filed

01/08/2021: Declaration Filed

Motion re:

01/08/2021: Motion re:

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: for prejudgment possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion for Prejudgment Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialLinde Inc.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-21295; Linde Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialLinde Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Kimberly Young in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion for Prejudgment Posession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition to Motion Filed; Comment: for Prejudgment Posession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435 check paid on 4/22/21 for 1st appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialUnion Carbride Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialSouthern California Edison Company; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialCity of Fontana; Total Financial Assessment: $525.00; Total Payments and Credits: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Lis Pendens ( filed concurrently with complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Deposit - Action in Eminent Domain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where a municipal corporation and a chartered city is a litigant

Latest cases where A Delaware Corp. XPO Logistics is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLCARE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC. DBA FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant