This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/19/2021 at 15:52:14 (UTC).

CITIBANK -V- JERRIANA DURAN

Case Summary

On 01/03/2011 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JERRIANA DURAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/03/2012

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2012

DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011

DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2011

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2011

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) CASE COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2011

DocketSubstituted Service; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 01/24/2011; Comment: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JERRIANA DURAN SERVED ON 01/24/11 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2011

DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/11 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT N1.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2011

DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: MAILING FILED BY CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2011

DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED BY CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2011

DocketProof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:; Comment: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JERRIANA DURAN SERVED ON 01/24/11 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2011

DocketCase Number Changed; Comment: CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM UD/NS1100001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2011

DocketParties Referred to Alternate Dispute Resolution; Comment: PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2011

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2011

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2011

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2011

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2011

DocketCase and Party Information added; Comment: CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 110103-3450-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less